Praetorian Insurance Company v. The Estate of Joshua K. Apo et al
Plaintiff: Praetorian Insurance Company
Defendant: The Estate of Joshua K. Apo and Kihei Rent A Car, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00373
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/26/2018. (afc)
November 26, 2018 Filing 19 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order.Non-Jury Trial is set for 11/05/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 09/24/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 08/05/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Dispositive Motions filed by 06/05/2019. Discovery due by 09/06/2019. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:25 - 9:28.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Praetorian Insurance Company re #16 Scheduling Conference Statement [AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE] (Kon-Herrera, Sheree)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Praetorian Insurance Company re #15 Report of Planning Meeting [AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE] (Kon-Herrera, Sheree)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement by Plaintiff Praetorian Insurance Company. (Kon-Herrera, Sheree)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Kon-Herrera, Sheree)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Kihei Rent A Car Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Ward)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kihei Rent A Car, Inc.. (Jones, Ward)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 Defendant Kihei Rent A Car, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kihei Rent A Car, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service (Answer to Complaint))(Jones, Ward)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Praetorian Insurance Company. Kihei Rent A Car, Inc.. (Kon-Herrera, Sheree)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Praetorian Insurance Company. The Estate of Joshua K. Apo. (Kon-Herrera, Sheree)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/26/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kihei Rent A Car, Inc. (emt, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Estate of Joshua K. Apo. (emt, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Praetorian Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group Limited, Corporate Parent QBE Investments (North America), Inc., Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Holdings Pty Limited for Praetorian Insurance Company.. (Ching, Wesley)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00373 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Kon-Herrera, Sheree)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Kon-Herrera, Sheree)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2097142.), filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kon-Herrera, Sheree)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Praetorian Insurance Company v. The Estate of Joshua K. Apo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Joshua K. Apo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kihei Rent A Car, Inc.
Represented By: Ward D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praetorian Insurance Company
Represented By: Sheree A. Kon-Herrera
Represented By: Wesley H.H. Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?