Harper v. Hawaii Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Jami L. Harper
Defendant: Paul K. Ferreira, Doe Defendants 1-50, Hawaii Police Department and Harry S. Kubojiri
Case Number: 1:2018cv00378
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, State of Hawaii re #9 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT. (emt, )
October 9, 2018 10 Transmittal Letter from the Clerk's Office to the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, State of Hawaii re ECF No. #9 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT, dated October 9, 2018. (emt, )
October 9, 2018 9 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT re #7 - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 10/9/2018. Plaintiff and the County hereby stipulate to having this matter remanded to the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit of the State of Hawai'i. (emt, )
October 5, 2018 8 On October 3, 2018, Plaintiff filed:MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT. (ECF No. #7 ).Defendants shall file their Opposition on or before Monday, October 22, 2018.Plaintiff shall file his Reply on or before Wednesday, November 7, 2018.A hearing on Plaintiffs Motion (ECF No. #7 ) shall be held on Monday, November 19, 2018 at 10:30 AM, before the Honorable Helen Gillmor. (rls, )
October 3, 2018 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court ; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Certificate of Service Jason Robert Kwiat appearing for Plaintiff Jami L. Harper (Kwiat, Jason)
October 3, 2018 6 EO: Lockey White may appear by telephone for the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/18 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
October 3, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of Paul K. Ferreira, Hawaii Police Department, Harry S. Kubojiri on behalf of Paul K. Ferreira, Hawaii Police Department, Harry S. Kubojiri. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Laureen)
October 3, 2018 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
October 3, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/5/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/3/2018. (afc)
October 3, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00378-HG-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)
October 3, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harry S. Kubojiri, Paul K. Ferreira, Hawaii Police Department from Third Circuit Court - Kona, case number 18-1-109K. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2098442), filed by Harry S. Kubojiri, Paul K. Ferreira, Hawaii Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lockey E. White, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(White, Lockey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Hawaii Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul K. Ferreira
Represented By: Lockey E. White
Represented By: Laureen L. Martin
Represented By: John S. Mukai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Police Department
Represented By: Lockey E. White
Represented By: Laureen L. Martin
Represented By: John S. Mukai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry S. Kubojiri
Represented By: Lockey E. White
Represented By: Laureen L. Martin
Represented By: John S. Mukai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami L. Harper
Represented By: Andrew M. Kennedy
Represented By: Michael Harrington Schlueter
Represented By: Jason Robert Kwiat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?