Napoleon v. Hawaii Community Corrections Center

Plaintiff: Daniel K. Napoleon
Defendant: Hawaii Community Corrections Center, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2 and State of Hawaii
Interested Party: Laurie Nadamoto and Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2018cv00382
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS (Non-Prisoner Complaint) filed by Daniel K. Napoleon against State of Hawaii; Hawaii Community Correctional Center; Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal letter re: NEW ADDRESS*, #2 Mailing documentation) (afc) *Transmittal letter states in part that Mr. Napoleon is leaving this location [Hawaii State Hospital]; return address by 15th November: DANIEL K. NAPOLEON40 MAKANI AVE.WAHIAWA, HI 96786
October 16, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #5 Order and Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Daniel K. Napoleon. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib, )
October 16, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER Dismissing Complaint With Leave To Amend re #1 .For the foregoing reasons, the Complaint is DISMISSED with leave granted to amend on or before November 16, 2018. Failure to timely file an amended complaint may result in AUTOMATIC DISMISSAL of this action without further notice for failure to prosecute or comply with a court order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Napoleon a blank civil rights complaint form so that he can amend his pleadings. Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 10/16/2018. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) .
October 12, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION #2 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 10/12/2018. (afc)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 4, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER: Court Will Assess Case Status on Monday, January 7, 2019 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/4/2018. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 4, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Daniel K. Napoleon. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib, )
October 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Hawaii Community Corrections Center filed by Daniel K. Napoleon. (Attachments: #1 Letter addressed to Clerk, #2 mailing documentation)(cib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Napoleon v. Hawaii Community Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Community Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel K. Napoleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?