Sandal v. Terminix International Company Limited Partnership, The

Plaintiff: George A. Sandal
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50 and Terminix International Company Limited Partnership, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv00383
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2018 8 EO: Pursuant to Eric Seitz's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 1/8/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/2/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
October 11, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by George A. Sandal. Terminix International Company Limited Partnership, The served on 10/11/2018. (emt, )
October 5, 2018 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 5, 2018 5 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/3/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 5, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Terminix International Company Limited Partnership, The. (emt, )
October 5, 2018 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00383 DKW-KSC on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 5, 2018 2 Summons (Proposed) (Seitz, Eric)
October 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2100585.), filed by George A. Sandal. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandal v. Terminix International Company Limited Partnership, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terminix International Company Limited Partnership, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A. Sandal
Represented By: Gina May Szeto-Wong
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Della A. Belatti
Represented By: Jonathan M.F. Loo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?