Beecroft, et al v. Hawaiian Airlines Inc.

Plaintiff: Alexander Beecroft and Emi Saegusa-Beecroft
Defendant: Hawaiian Airlines Inc. and Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00384
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
1 Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 49:1471
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2018 22 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stewart, Andrew)
December 3, 2018 21 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Alexander Beecroft, Emi Saegusa-Beecroft. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stewart, Andrew)
December 3, 2018 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaiian Airlines Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Miyashiro, Duane)
December 3, 2018 19 Scheduling Conference Statement by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Miyashiro, Duane)
November 30, 2018 18 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Stewart, Andrew)
November 13, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice As To Michael Cutler re #13 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/13/2018. (cib, )
November 13, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard A. Lazenby re #12 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/13/2018. (cib, )
November 8, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Christine S. Madriaga on behalf of Hawaiian Airlines Inc. on behalf of Hawaiian Airlines Inc.. (Madriaga, Jamie Christine)
November 6, 2018 14 Errata re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael Cutler Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2114686. . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel and "Attachment A")(Miyashiro, Duane)
November 6, 2018 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael Cutler Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2114686.Duane R. Miyashiro appearing for Defendant Hawaiian Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Designation and Consent of Counsel, #3 Proposed Order)(Miyashiro, Duane)
November 6, 2018 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Lazenby Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2114684.Duane R. Miyashiro appearing for Defendant Hawaiian Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Designation and Consent of Counsel, #3 Proposed Order)(Miyashiro, Duane)
November 5, 2018 11 LETTER dated May 8, 2017 from Chief U.S. District Judge J. Michael Seabright addressed to Christopher S. Salanoa in re: Mr. Salanoa's submission of documents for review. (afc)
November 2, 2018 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaiian Airlines Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. for Hawaiian Airlines Inc... (Miyashiro, Duane)
November 2, 2018 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hawaiian Airlines Inc..(Miyashiro, Duane)
October 17, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Beecroft, Emi Saegusa-Beecroft. Hawaiian Airlines Inc served on 10/12/2018.. (Stewart, Andrew) Modified on 10/18/2018 (emt, ).
October 9, 2018 7 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Alexander Beecroft, Emi Saegusa-Beecroft. (Stewart, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib, )
October 9, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Hawaiian Airlines Inc. (cib, )
October 9, 2018 4 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 12/10/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, ) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
October 9, 2018 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00384-HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib, )
October 9, 2018 2 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Hawaiian Airlines Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2101009.), filed by Alexander Beecroft, Emi Saegusa-Beecroft.(Stewart, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beecroft, et al v. Hawaiian Airlines Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Airlines Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Lazenby
Represented By: Michael Cutler
Represented By: Duane R. Miyashiro
Represented By: Jamie Christine S. Madriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Beecroft
Represented By: Andrew D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emi Saegusa-Beecroft
Represented By: Andrew D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?