Gaston et al v. Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc.

Plaintiff: Sonia Gaston and Ricky Gaston
Defendant: Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc., Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00387
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
1 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 15 Featured Case RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/20/2018. (emt, )
November 20, 2018 14 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held.Mr. Ranken informs the Court that dates have been discussed and proposes a March 2020 trial with 60 days between Plaintiff's and Defendant's Expert deadlines. Dates are given as follows. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for on 03/23/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 02/11/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 12/16/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/23/2019. Discovery due by 01/24/2020. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:35 - 9:42.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 19, 2018 13 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing not held.Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued to November 20, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield.Parties may participate via telephone. Parties have been provided with the call in instructions to the AT&T Service.(FTR-Ctrm C6 10:05 - 10:07.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 14, 2018 12 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Ranken, Anthony)
November 9, 2018 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc. (Wack, Shannon)
November 9, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc. (Wack, Shannon)
November 9, 2018 9 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wack, Shannon)
November 6, 2018 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wack, Shannon)
October 31, 2018 7 [AMENDED DOCUMENT] Amended Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26 by Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc.. . (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(Wack, Shannon) Modified on 11/20/2018 (emt, ).
October 30, 2018 6 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wack, Shannon)
October 10, 2018 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc.. (Wack, Shannon)
October 10, 2018 4 Defendant Hard Rock Caf International (STP), Inc.s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Wack, Shannon)
October 10, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/19/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 10, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00387 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc. from Circuit Court of the Second Circuit, case number 18-1-0176(1). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2102137), filed by Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Wack, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaston et al v. Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hard Rock Cafe International (STP), Inc.
Represented By: Arthur F. Roeca
Represented By: Shannon L. Wack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Gaston
Represented By: Anthony L. Ranken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Gaston
Represented By: Anthony L. Ranken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?