Grandinetti v. State HPA et al

Plaintiff: F. Grandinetti
Defendant: State HPA, Hawaii State Agency, Saguaro Contractors and DPS
Interested Party: Laurie Nadamoto and Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2018cv00388
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
1 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2018 12 EO: For the reasons set forth in the 11/15/2018 Order (1) Vacating Dismissal Order; (2) Denying In Forma Pauperis Application; (3) Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and (4) Denying Certificate of Appealability [ECF 8], Petitioner's Motion, Exhibits (PI/TRO), seeking an injunction or release [ECF 10], and Motion With Respect to Agency Law [ECF 11], are DENIED. The court will take no further action in this case, beyond processing a notice of appeal. IT IS SO ORDERED. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 19, 2018 11 MOTION With Respect To "Agency Law" For HPA, DPS, and State; et al filed by Plaintiff Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation) (afc)
November 19, 2018 10 MOTION, EXHIBITS (PI/TRO) (With PLRA 1915(g) torts, ongoing) 28 USC 1404-1407 MDL Venues filed by Plaintiff F. Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
November 15, 2018 9 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (afc) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants will be served on November 16, 2018 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 15, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER (1) VACATING DISMISSAL ORDER #4 ; (2) DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION #5 ; (3) DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS #1 ; AND (4) DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. "The Clerk is DIRECTED to process Grandinetti's Notice of Appeal as filed, enter judgment, and terminate this action." Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/15/2018. (afc)NOTICE of Appeal: ECF #6 : 9CCA no. 18-17210 COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants will be served on November 16, 2018 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). U.S. Court of Appeals served electronically via NEF.
November 15, 2018 7 USCA Case Number 18-17210 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by F. Grandinetti. "This petition [for a writ of habeas corpus] is subject to a pre-filing review order entered in case number 06-80108. The petition will be reviewed by the Court to determine whether it will be permitted to proceed."(afc)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 8, 2018 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Deficiency Order - filed by F. Grandinetti. 9CCA no. 18-17210 Filing fee $ 505. NOT PAID; no fee or motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis submitted. (Attachments: #1 Mailing documentation (Envelope stamped, initialed and dated 11/1/2018 by facility; postmark date: 11/2/2018)) (afc) Docket entry modified on 11/15/2018 to add USCA case number. (afc).
November 8, 2018 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff F. Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing documentation (Envelope stamped and initialed by facility; postmark date: 11/1/2018)) (afc)
November 7, 2018 4 EO: On October 9, 2018, the court ordered Petitioner to pay the civil filing fee or submit an in forma pauperis application within twenty-eight (28) days. ECF No. #2 . Petitioner failed to pay the filing fee or submit an in forma pauperis application within the time given, although he filed non-responsive documents in other actions, showing that he has the ability to respond to the courts orders when it suits him. See Grandinetti v. State, No. 1:18-cv-00374 LEK Mot., ECF No. 3. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ENTER JUDGMENT dismissing this action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See Ferdik v. Bonzelet, 963 F.2d 1258, 1260 (9th Cir. 1992), See In re Phenylpropanolamine (PPA) Cases, 460 F.3d 1217, 1226 (9th Cir. 2006); Malone v. U.S. Postal Serv., 833 F.2d 128, 132-33 (9th Cir. 1987). IT IS SO ORDERED. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 29, 2018 3 Submission of Inmate Request Form by F. Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing documentation (Envelope stamped and dated 10/23/1028 by institution; postmark date of 10/24/2018)) (afc)STAFF NOTATION: A case number is not noted on the document. The document is entered in Mr. Grandinetti's opened case.
October 9, 2018 2 Featured Case HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/9/2018. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE A copy of the instant Order and the "Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner" form with its instructions was served by the Clerk's office/L.S. and served on October 10, 2018 by first class mail addressed to Mr. Grandinetti at his address of record.
October 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by F. Grandinetti: "Federal 'Parole Hearings'/Complaint and FRCP 65 TRO proofs/28 USC 1404-1407 MDL venues" "Federal Complaint of Habeas Corpus and No Lawyer or ATC Allowed, Ongoing HPA hearings and custody...." (Attachments: #1 State of Hawaii DPS form: Authorization to Release/Obtain Medical Information, #2 Medical Request form - dated 2/6/17 by Health Care Staff, #3 Refusal to Accept Medical Treatment forms, #4 Letter dated June 5, 2018 addressed to Mr. Grandinetti from Tina Agaran RN, #5 Various Inmate Request Forms, #6 Saguaro DISP SEG Order Guide, #7 Indigent Status Inmate Request signed by Saguaro CC Business Manager/Designee on 9/7/2018, #8 Mailing documentation (Envelope stamped, initialed and dated 10/4/2018 by facility and postmarked 10/5/2018). (afc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandinetti v. State HPA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State HPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii State Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saguaro Contractors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. Grandinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?