Grandinetti v. Hegmann
Plaintiff: Francis Grandinetti
Defendant: Dr. Michael Hegmann
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2018cv00396
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 11/28/2018 pursuant to #3 DISMISSAL ORDER. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 29, 2018. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/28/2018. Grandinetti's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice as frivolous. To the extent he seeks a temporary restraining order or any other relief based on his pleading, all pending motions or requests are DENIED. This action is also terminated for Grandinetti's failure to pay the civil filing fee or otherwise respond to the October 16, 2018 Deficiency Order. The Clerk shall close the file. Grandinetti is NOTIFIED that the Court will take no action on any further requests or motions submitted in this action, beyond processing a notice of appeal. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 29, 2018. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/15/2018. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE A copy of the instant Order and the "Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner" form with its instructions was served by the Clerk's office/AFC and served on October 16, 2018 by first class mail addressed to Mr. Francis Grandinetti at his address of record.
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: "Hawaii Pro Se Plaintiff Rule 65 TRO Motion/Application" - Complaint filed by Francis Grandinetti against Dr. Michael Hegmann, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Letter dated 5/25/2018 from State of Hawaii Office of the Ombudsman addressed to Mr. Grandinetti, #2 Various Medical Request forms, #3 Saguaro Correctional Center - Report of Plaintiff's vitals, #4 Inmate Request form, #5 Mr. Grandinetti's letters addressed to State of Hawaii Ombudsman, #6 Saguaro Correctional Center Informal Resoluation form, #7 Various Medical Request forms, #8 Inmate Request form, #9 Mailing documentation (Mailing envelope initialed and dated 10/11/2018 by facility; postmark date: 10/12/2018)) (afc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandinetti v. Hegmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Grandinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michael Hegmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?