Peng v. University Health Alliance
Petitioner: Haibo Peng
Respondent: University Health Alliance
Case Number: 1:2018cv00413
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
2 Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00413 HG-RT on all future pleadings . (emt, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 EO: Pursuant to Deirdre Marie-Iha's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 1/29/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/22/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT AND EXHIBITS: Petitioner's Memorandum in Support of Petition and Exhibits 3-5, 8-12 and 14-17 re #1 - filed by University Health Alliance. SEALED pursuant to ECF No. #10 Order. (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2018: #1 Memorandum in Support of Petition, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17) (emt, ).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PETITION AND EXHIBITS 3-5, 8-12, AND 14-17 TO PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF VALIDITY OF CLAIM OF LIEN BY UNIVERSITY HEALTH ALLIANCE, FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT ON 10/29/2018 re #6 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 12/4/2018. (emt, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII, SP NO. 18-1-0381-JHA (Re: transmittal of (Confidential) Memorandum in Support and of Petition for Determination of Validity of Claim of Lien and Exhibits 3-5, 8-12 and 14-17 by University Health Alliance, filed October 29, 2108). (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index) (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2018: #3 Memorandum in Support of Petition, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17) (emt, ).
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII; SP NO. 18-1-0381- JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Petition for Determination of Validity of Claim of Lien; Memorandum; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits 1-17; Notice of Hearing and Certificate of Service, #4 Petition for Determination of Validity of Claim of Lien; Memorandum; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits 1-17; Notice of Hearing and Certificate of Service, #5 Information Designated Confidential Pursuant to Rule 9 of the Hawaii Court Records Rules, #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit 1; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by University Health Alliance re #1 Notice of Removal, 2 Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Set Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #6 EX PARTE Motion to File Under Seal Petitioner's Memo in Support of Petition for Determination of Validity of Claim of Lien by University Health Alliance filed in First Circuit Court on 10/29/18, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Saffery, Edmund)
November 16, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY. Re: The entry docket number #6 EX PARTE Motion to File Under Seal Petitioner's Memo in Support of Petition for Determination of Validity of Claim of Lien by University Health Alliance filed in First Circuit Court on 10/29/18 filed by University Health Alliance ~ Please be advised that viewing access to this document is restricted to the filing party and the Court (filing events from the "Ex Parte" Filings category, will restrict viewing of the entry to the Court and the filing party). The Certificate of Service reflects that service was made electronically, through CM/ECF. The filing party may refile the entry as a public document by selecting a filing event from the "motions" category. Alternatively, an amended certificate of service may be filed. (emt, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 EX PARTE Motion to File Under Seal Petitioner's Memo in Support of Petition for Determination of Validity of Claim of Lien by University Health Alliance filed in First Circuit Court on 10/29/18 Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Respondent University Health Alliance (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Saffery, Edmund)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/17/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by University Health Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Saffery, Edmund)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by University Health Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Saffery, Edmund)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00413 HG-KSC on all further pleadings. (emt, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by University Health Alliance from First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number S.P. No. 18-1-0381. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2117686), filed by University Health Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Saffery, Edmund)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peng v. University Health Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: University Health Alliance
Represented By: Deirdre Marie-Iha
Represented By: Edmund K. Saffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Haibo Peng
Represented By: Robert A. Creps
Represented By: Sharon Paris
Represented By: Woodruff K. Soldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?