Yellen v. Social Security Administration et al

Plaintiff: Mike Yellen
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv00422
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: ALAN C KAY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 EO: On December 20, 2018, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Appear by Phone. The Court having allowed the Plaintiff to appear by telephone for the Rule 16 on December 19, 2018, finds the Motion filed on December 20, 2018 moot.granting #10 Motion. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear by Phone re: 12/31/2018 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; Certificate of Service - filed by Plaintiff Mike Yellen. (Attachments: #1 Mailing documentation) (afc)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 EO: Mike Yellen is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/19 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/31/18 @ 9:00 AM is CONTINUED to 1/4/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 12/28/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK's Letter to Mr. Yellen re: Transmittal of documents/forms relative to the Order granting IFP #4 . (afc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet transmitted to Mr. Yellen: (Attachments: NOTICE TO PARTIES re: Service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form, #2 AO 399 form, #3 USM-285 form, #4 USM-285 instructions) (afc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (afc)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re: #2 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 11/7/2018. (afc) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/31/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG.Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Memorandum) (afc)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Mr. Mike Yellen was served by the Clerk's office/L.G. and served on October 31, 2018 by first class mail to his address of record.
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mike Yellen. (afc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against U.S. Social Security Administration; Nancy Berryhill, Commissioner, Social Security Administration - filed by Mike Yellen. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (afc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellen v. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?