Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds(Pension Trust Fund), et al v. A-LEGACY CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Plaintiff: Hawaii Operating Engineers Industry Stabilization Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Trustees Of The Operating Engineers' Trust Fund(Pension Trust Fund), Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmation Action Training Fund for Hawaii, Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund and Hawaii Health & Welfare Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Defendant: A-LEGACY CONSTRUCTION, LLC and A-Legacy Construction LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00424
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 17 DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK AGAINST DEFENDANT A-LEGACY CONTRUCTION LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED against Defendant, in the sum of $6,551.86, together with interest accruing from May 25, 2018 until entry of this judgment herein at $.03 per diem, plus legal interest from entry of this judgment until paid. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the entry of this judgment shall be without prejudice to Plaintiffs' right to seek other and further sums owed by Defendant arising from hours worked during any period of time not heretofore audited.(afc)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST Default Judgment by Hawaii Health & Welfare Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund, Hawaii Operating Engineers Industry Stabilization Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmation Action Training Fund for Hawaii, Trustees Of The Operating Engineers' Trust Fund(Pension Trust Fund). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jerry P.S. Chang, #2 Declaration of Ryan Ilacqua, #3 Statement of Amounts Due, #4 [Proposed] Default Judgment, #5 Certificate of Service)(Chang, Jerry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 EO: In light of the #14 Clerk's Entry of Default, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/31/2018 is VACATED. Plaintiff shall seek default judgment no later than 01/17/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant A-Legacy Construction LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company re #13 . (emt, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST Entry of Default by Hawaii Health & Welfare Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund, Hawaii Operating Engineers Industry Stabilization Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmation Action Training Fund for Hawaii, Trustees Of The Operating Engineers' Trust Fund(Pension Trust Fund). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Entry of Default)(Ikeda, Ashley)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees Of The Operating Engineers' Trust Fund(Pension Trust Fund), Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Hawaii Operating Engineers Industry Stabilization Trust Fund, Hawaii Health & Welfare Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmation Action Training Fund for Hawaii. All Defendants. A-Legacy Construction LLC served on 11/17/2018. (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 12/18/2018 (emt, ).
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees Of The Operating Engineers' Trust Fund(Pension Trust Fund). All Defendants. Jestinn D. Acosta served on 11/17/2018. (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 11/21/2018 (emt, ).
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 Amended Summons Issued as to A-Legacy Construction LLC. (emt, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Ikeda, Ashley)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number HI025143 re #1 Complaint. (cib, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Assignment To United States Magistrate Judge. (Attachments: #1 Election Form - Consent To Jurisdiction By United States Magistrate Judge)(cib, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to A-LEGACY CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (cib, )
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 12/31/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, ) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00424-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds. (Chang, Jerry)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Chang, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds(Pension Trust Fund), et al v. A-LEGACY CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Operating Engineers Industry Stabilization Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Operating Engineers' Trust Fund(Pension Trust Fund)
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmation Action Training Fund for Hawaii
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Health & Welfare Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-LEGACY CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Legacy Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?