PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds v. Ekahi Fire Protection LLC et al
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds
Defendant: Bernadette Patinio, Doe Trusts 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, DOE Partnerships 1-10, Ekahi Fire Protection LLC and Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00426
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 EO: In light of the #10 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/31/2018 IS CONTINUED TO 02/13/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 02/06/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Stay; Certificate of Service - by Ekahi Fire Protection LLC. [filed by Donald L. Spafford, Jr., Esq., bankruptcy attorney for Debtor Ekahi Fire Protection LLC] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A") (emt, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds. Bernadette Patinio served on 11/13/2018. (Kawashima, Jared) Modified on 11/21/2018 (emt, ).
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds. Ekahi Fire Protection LLC served on 11/13/2018. (Kawashima, Jared) Modified on 11/21/2018 (emt, ).
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ekahi Fire Protection LLC, Bernadette Patinio. (afc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form to Consent) (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). *** The party filing the case is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice of Assignment and the attached Election Form.
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/31/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/5/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00426 KJM on all further pleadings. (afc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Summons against Ekahi Fire Protection LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2114009.), filed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kawada, Christin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds v. Ekahi Fire Protection LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Patinio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekahi Fire Protection LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?