Emrit v. Desert Parkway Behavioral Hospital
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Desert Parkway Behavioral Hospital
Case Number: 1:2018cv00435
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Ronald Satish Emrit - 655 38th Lane East Sarasota, FL 34243 re #1 - Complaint, #2 - Motion For IFP, #3 - Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (Attachments: #1 return to sender envelope) (cib, )
November 14, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Intake Staff mailed a copy of #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit at the following address: 6655 38th Lane East. Sarasota, FL 34243. Additional copies mailed to 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20270. (cib, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Desert Parkway Behavioral Hospital filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 mailing documentation)(cib, ) On Page 6 of the Complaint, the plaintiff identifies his current address as: 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720.Address reflected on the mailing envelope as 6655 38th Lane East. Sarasota, FL 34243

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Desert Parkway Behavioral Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Parkway Behavioral Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?