Emrit v. Saint Rose de Lima Hospital
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Saint Rose de Lima Hospital
Case Number: 1:2018cv00436
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service upon Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit re: Service of the "ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (ECF NO. 6)" filed as ECF #12 , and service of the "JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE" filed as ECF #13 . In light of the unsuccessful service attempts by first class mail addressed to Mr. Emrit at various mailing addresses, Mr. Emrit was served electronically via Notice of Electronic Filing ("NEF") at the e-mail addresses as included in his complaint: einsteinrockstar2@outlook.comandeinsteinrockstar@hotmail.com(afc)
December 31, 2018 Filing 13 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE re: Orders #6 , #12 . (afc)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (ECF NO. #6 ). Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 12/31/2018. (afc)
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Re: #2 , #3 , #4 , and #5 ) Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit at 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115. (jo)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ( re: #6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE ). Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit at 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720 returned undeliverable. (emt, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Ronald Satish Emrit - 655 38th Lane East Sarasota, FL 34243 re #1 - Complaint, #3 - Application For IFP, #4 - Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #5 - Civil Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 return to sender envelope) (cib, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re #6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE). Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit at 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115 returned undeliverable. (emt, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re #6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE). Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit at 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243 returned undeliverable. (emt, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 11/19/2018. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Ronald Satish Emrit served by First Class Mail to the following addresses: 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243, 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720 and 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115 on November 19, 2018.
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Intake Staff mailed a copy of the Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and copies of the Complaint and IFP application to Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit at the following address: 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243 on November 14, 2018 (address referenced on mailing envelope). Additionally, copies were mailed to Mr. Emrit at the following addresses: 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720 (referenced on page 6 of Complaint) and 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115 (identified as Plaintiff's "current" mailing address on page 2 of the Complaint) on November 15, 2018.
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Saint Rose de Lima Hospital - filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Note: On page 2 of the Complaint, the Plaintiff identifies his current mailing address as: 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115. The following address: 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720 is reflected on Page 6 of the Complaint (this address is identified by Plaintiff as his "current" mailing address in the following cases, CV 18-00437 DKW-KSC, CV 18-00438 HG-KSC). The address reflected on the mailing envelope is 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Saint Rose de Lima Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Rose de Lima Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?