Emrit v. Regional Transit Center (RTC)
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Regional Transit Center (RTC)
Case Number: 1:2018cv00438
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service upon Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit re: Service of the "ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (ECF NO. 6)" filed as ECF #9 , and service of the "JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE" filed as ECF #10 . In light of the unsuccessful service attempts by first class mail addressed to Mr. Emrit at various mailing addresses, Mr. Emrit was served electronically via Notice of Electronic Filing ("NEF") at the e-mail addresses as included in his complaint: einsteinrockstar2@outlook.comandeinsteinrockstar@hotmail.com(afc)
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ronald Satish Emrit 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115 re #6 Findings and Recommendation to Grant Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees and Dismiss The Complaint Without Prejudice (jo)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE re: Orders #6 , #9 . (afc)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (ECF No. #6 ). Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 12/31/2018. (afc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail addressed to Ronald Satish Emrit at 6655 38th Lane East address returned as ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN. Documents returned: Minute Orders entered as ECF nos. #4 and (5). (afc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Ronald Satish Emrit - 6655 38th Lane East Sarasota, FL 34243 re: #1 - Complaint, #2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 - Application For IFP, #4 - Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (Attachments: #1 return to sender envelope) (cib, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 11/21/2018. Based on the foregoing, the Court FINDS AND RECOMMENDS that the district court: (1) GRANT Plaintiff's Application to Proceed District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs; and (2) DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Ronald Satish Emrit served by First Class Mail to the following addresses: 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243, 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720 and 4529 Townwall Street, Las Vegas, NV 89115 on November 21, 2018.
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 1/23/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/16/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Intake Staff mailed a copy of the Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and copies of the Complaint and IFP application to Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit at the following address: 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243 on November 14, 2018 (address referenced on mailing envelope). Additionally, copies were mailed to Mr. Emrit at the following address (identified by Plaintiff as his "current" mailing address): 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720 on November 15, 2018.
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Regional Transit Center (RTC) - filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. Note: On page 2 of the Complaint, the Plaintiff identifies his current mailing address as: 5108 Cornelias Prospect Drive, Bowie, MD 20720. The address reflected on the mailing envelope is 6655 38th Lane East, Sarasota, FL 34243 . (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Regional Transit Center (RTC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Transit Center (RTC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?