DeMarco v. State of Hawaii Department of Human Services
Plaintiff: Valerie DeMarco
Defendant: State of Hawaii Department of Human Services, Hawaii Public Housing Authority and State of Hawaii, Department of Human Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv00450
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 EO: The Court continues the Settlement Conference set for 3/21/19 @ 10:00 AM to 3/27/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Rom Trader before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties notified. Confidential settlement conference statements are due by 3/20/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/14/2019. (emt, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held inchambers. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order.Non-Jury Trial is set for 01/28/2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/17/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 03/21/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Rom Trader before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 10/9/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Rom Trader before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 08/28/2019. Discovery due by 11/29/2019. (Ctrm C6 - No Record 9:30-9:50.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement by State of Hawaii, Department of Human Services, and Hawaii Public Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Phillips, Lunsford)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII; CV 18-1-1707-10 GWBC. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Summons, #5 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (State of Hawaii, Dept. of Human Services, Hawaii Public Housing Authority), #6 Notice of Removal; Exhibit "1"; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Valerie DeMarco and Defendants Hawaii Public Housing Authority, State of Hawaii, Department of Human Services. Please continue to reflect case number CV 18-00450 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Hawaii Public Housing Authority, State of Hawaii, Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule and to allow parties sufficient time to submit their #4 Election Form, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/24/2018 IS CONTINUED TO 01/14/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. Do not e-file the Election Form. After completing the form, parties can either email it to consent@hid.uscourts.gov, or mail it to U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd., Room C-338, Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov. (emt, )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/24/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00450 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State of Hawaii Department of Human Services from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 18-1-1707-10 GWBC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2119572), filed by State of Hawaii Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeMarco v. State of Hawaii Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii Department of Human Services
Represented By: John M. Cregor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Represented By: John M. Cregor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii, Department of Human Services
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Represented By: John M. Cregor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie DeMarco
Represented By: Lunsford D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?