State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Arborscapes Services LLC
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Arborscapes Services LLC and Arborscapes Hawaii
Case Number: 1:2018cv00454
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Ortiz, Jonathan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 EO: At counsel's request to allow sufficient time for the Defendant to file their answer and statement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 01/28/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 03/04/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 02/25/2019. Counsel Christine Sakiko Prepose to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Arborscapes Services LLC served on 12/15/2018. (Ortiz, Jonathan) Modified on 12/28/2018 (emt, ).
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00454 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 EO: The Court directs the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Judge Mansfield will remain as the Magistrate Judge. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment To United States Magistrate Judge. (Attachments: #1 Election Form - Consent To Jurisdiction By United States Magistrate Judge)(cib, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arborscapes Services LLC. (cib, )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 1/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, ) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00454-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Ortiz, Jonathan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Arborscapes Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2120064.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Ortiz, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Arborscapes Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arborscapes Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arborscapes Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Cathy S. Juhn
Represented By: Christine Sakiko Prepose
Represented By: Jonathan L. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?