Rine v. Ko Olina Ocean Adventures, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Rine
Defendant: Ko Olina Ocean Adventures, Inc. and M/V Ko Olina Explorer 1183558
Case Number: 1:2018cv00464
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement by Ko Olina Ocean Adventures, Inc.. (Frame, Robert)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ko Olina Ocean Adventures, Inc.. (Frame, Robert)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ko Olina Ocean Adventures, Inc..(Frame, Robert)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 EO: Pursuant to Robert Frame's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 2/5/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/29/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement on behalf of Plaintiff, Patricia Rine. (Lesser, Richard)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Lesser, Richard)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case Please reflect new case number CV 18-00464-JAO-RT on all further pleadings . (apg, dist)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Rine. All Defendants. (Heidt, Janice)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ko Olina Ocean Adventures, Inc.. (afc)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Heidt, Janice)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 1/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, ) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00464-JAO-KSC on all further pleadings. (cib, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2122512.), filed by Patricia Rine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heidt, Janice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rine v. Ko Olina Ocean Adventures, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ko Olina Ocean Adventures, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. Frame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Ko Olina Explorer 1183558
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Rine
Represented By: Richard Turbin
Represented By: Janice D. Heidt
Represented By: Richard A. Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?