Hackett v. CNMI Election Commission
Plaintiff: Clifford Ray Hackett
Defendant: CNMI Election Commission
Case Number: 1:2018cv00474
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
2 Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Clifford Ray Hackett re #1 #2 #3 #4 . (cib)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Clifford Ray Hackett re #5 . (cib)
January 9, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 6 Notice of Case Reassignment,, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on to: Clifford Ray Hackett. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (apg, dist)
January 7, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #7 Order has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Clifford Ray Hackett. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Adopting Magistrate Judge' Findings and Recommendations re #5 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 1/7/2019. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case Please reflect new case number CV 18-00474-LEK-RT on all further pleadings . (apg, dist)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 17, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #5 has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Clifford Ray Hackett. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS To (1) Dismiss The Complaint With Leave To Amend and (2) Deny The Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Request To File By Fax and Request To File Electronically re #1 #2 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 12/14/2018. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 2/4/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served the foregoing document along with Doc #1 and #2 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, MOTION for Permission to file by facsimile & MOTION For Electronic Process Service by Plaintiff Clifford Ray Hackett. (Attachments: #1 Fax Coversheet) (jo) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/4/2018) (jo, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2018) (jo, ).
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant CNMI Election Commission filed by Plaintiff Clifford Ray Hackett. (Attachments: #1 Fax Coversheet) (jo) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/4/2018) (jo, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2018) (jo, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hackett v. CNMI Election Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNMI Election Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Ray Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?