Chambers v. Zimmer, Inc. dba Zimmer Biomet et al
Plaintiff: David A. Chambers
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. dba Zimmer Biomet and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00478
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
2 Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc served on 1/11/2019 filed by David A. Chambers.(Vaughan, Monica) Modified docket text to add service date on 1/24/2019 (cib).
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Pursuant to Wayne Parsons' request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 3/19/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 3/12/19 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 EO: Pursuant to Wayne Parsons' request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 2/26/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 2/19/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Application To Appear Pro Hac Vice re #7 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/10/2019. Monica C. Vaughn added as attorney pro hac vice for plaintiff David A. Chambers.(cib, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case Please reflect new case number CV 18-00478-LEK-RT on all further pleadings . (apg, dist)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Monica C. Vaughan Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2135685.Wayne D. Parsons appearing for Plaintiff David A. Chambers (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Standing State Bar of Texas, #3 Certificate of Standing Supreme Court of Texas, #4 Certificate of Service)(Parsons, Wayne)
December 7, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY: The entry docket number #6 Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge was filed incorrectly filed in this case as Magistrate Judge Kevin S.C. Chang has been assigned to this case. No further action necessary. (jo)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge. (The party filing the case or removal is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice and the attached Election Form). (Attachments: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) (jo)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 2/4/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 18-00478 LEK-KSC on all further pleadings (jo)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; SUMMONS; CIVIL COVER SHEET against David A. Chambers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2126949.), filed by David A. Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parsons, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Zimmer, Inc. dba Zimmer Biomet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Chambers
Represented By: Wayne D. Parsons
Represented By: Monica C. Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc. dba Zimmer Biomet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?