Foo, M.D. v. Azar II
Plaintiff: Wendell Foo, M.D.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv00490
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service Alex M. Azar II, Hon. Matthew G. Whitaker, Hon. Jessie K. Liu, Kenji M. Price, filed by Wendell Foo, M.D.. (Hansen, Jennifer)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 EO: Based on Plaintiff's counsel's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 02/08/2019 is CONTINUED to 3/20/2019 at 09:00AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 3/13/2019. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendell Foo, M.D.. Alex M. Azar, II. (Washkowitz, Jared)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATION OF JENNIFER A. HANSEN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re: #2 . Signed by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 12/14/2018. (afc) JENNIFER A. HANSEN, ESQ. (Law firm: Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, P.C.) added as attorney pro hac vice for plaintiff WENDELL FOO, M.D.
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (afc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/8/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/14/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00490-JAO-RLP on all further pleadings. (afc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Pro Hac Vice Admissionof Jennifer A. Hansen, Esq. of Hooper, Lundy, & Bookman PC, 101 W. Broadway, Suite 1200, San Diego, CA 92101 Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2130304.Jared A. Washkowitz appearing for Plaintiff Wendell Foo, M.D. (Washkowitz, Jared)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2130301.), filed by Wendell Foo, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Washkowitz, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foo, M.D. v. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Foo, M.D.
Represented By: Jared A. Washkowitz
Represented By: Jennifer A. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?