Inamullah, M.D. et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cyndy Baird, Alicia Hazelton, Michael Archibald, Sana Khalique, Robert Hazelton, Julie Olson, Cyril Martin, Jennifer Martin, Steve Olson, Russel Baird, Ovais Inamullah, M.D. and Shelley Archibald
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., Doe Defendants 1-50 and Kyo-Ya Hotels & Resorts, LP
Case Number: 1:2018cv00494
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 EO: The Court grants the Parties' request, the hearing on #16 MOTION to Certify Class, previously set for 3/1/2019, is hereby CONTINUED to June 28, 2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(rls, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/28/2019. (emt, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 EP: : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - (AMENDED) Discussion held.Jury Trial is set for 5/11/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Otake.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 5/11/2020 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/31/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 1/29/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Rom Trader before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/11/2019. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Discussion held.Non Jury Trial is set for 5/11/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Otake.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Non-Jury Trial is set for 5/11/2020 09:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/31/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 1/29/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Rom Trader before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/11/2019. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION to Certify Class :. Motion Hearing is set for 3/1/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (tbf, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Certify Class Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton appearing for Plaintiffs Michael Archibald, Shelley Archibald, Cyndy Baird, Russel Baird, Alicia Hazelton, Robert Hazelton, Ovais Inamullah, M.D., Sana Khalique, Cyril Martin, Jennifer Martin, Julie Olson, Steve Olson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of James J. Bickerton, #3 Declaration of Ovais Inamullah M.D., #4 Declaration of Sana Khalique, #5 Declaration of Cyril Martin, #6 Declaration of Jennifer Martin, #7 Declaration of Russell Baird, #8 Declaration of Cyndy Baird, #9 Declaration of Michael Archibald, #10 Declaration of Shelley Archibald, #11 Declaration of Steve Olson, #12 Declaration of Robert Hazelton, #13 Declaration of Alicia Hazelton, #14 Exhibit A, #15 Exhibit B, #16 Exhibit C, #17 Exhibit D, #18 Exhibit E, #19 Exhibit F, #20 Exhibit G, #21 Exhibit H, #22 Notice of Hearing, #23 Certificate of Service)(Morgan-Bickerton, Bridget)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiffs' Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Morgan-Bickerton, Bridget)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Shimazu, Wesley)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Roy, Stephen)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Roy, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting of the Parties. (Morgan-Bickerton, Bridget)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant Kyo-ya Hotels & Resorts, LP's ANSWER to Complaint (ECF Doc. 6-4) by Kyo-Ya Hotels & Resorts, LP.(Shimazu, Wesley)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Michael Archibald, Shelley Archibald, Cyndy Baird, Russel Baird, Alicia Hazelton, Robert Hazelton, Ovais Inamullah, M.D., Sana Khalique, Cyril Martin, Jennifer Martin, Julie Olson, Steve Olson Notice of Firm Name Change; COS Michael Archibald, Shelley Archibald, Cyndy Baird, Russel Baird, Alicia Hazelton, Robert Hazelton, Ovais Inamullah, M.D., Sana Khalique, Cyril Martin, Jennifer Martin, Julie Olson, Steve Olson. (Morgan, Bridget)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG no longer assigned to case Please reflect new case number CV 18-00494-JAO-RT on all further pleadings . (apg, dist)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kyo-Ya Hotels & Resorts, LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shimazu, Wesley)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii: Civil No. 18-1-1796-11 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re HAJIS, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint, #5 First Amended Complaint, #6 Additional Claims Sheet, #7 Return and Acknowledgment of Service, #8 Return and Acknowledgment of Service, #9 Defendant Kyo-Ya Hotels & Resorts, LP's Notice of Removal filed in Circuit Court) (jo)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sumida, Kevin)
December 22, 2018 Filing 4 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Kyo-Ya Hotels & Resorts, LP DEFENDANT MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.S CONSENT AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT KYO-YA HOTELS & RESORTS NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sumida, Kevin)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 1/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, ) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00494-JAO-KSC on all further pleadings. (cib, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kyo-Ya Hotels & Resorts, LP from First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number Civil No. 18-1-1796-11 JHA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2133604), filed by Kyo-Ya Hotels & Resorts, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee Nakahara, #2 Exhibit "1", #3 Exhibit "2", #4 Certificate of Service)(Shimazu, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inamullah, M.D. et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyndy Baird
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Hazelton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Archibald
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sana Khalique
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hazelton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Olson
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyril Martin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Martin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Olson
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel Baird
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ovais Inamullah, M.D.
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Archibald
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P.H. Sumida
Represented By: Anthony L. Wong
Represented By: Lance S. Au
Represented By: Stephen K Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyo-Ya Hotels & Resorts, LP
Represented By: Leslie R. Kop
Represented By: Wesley D. Shimazu
Represented By: Nathan H. Yoshimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?