State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. HP Inc.

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: HP Inc., John Doe Individuals 1-10 and John Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00003
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE as to BRYAN R. CAMPBELL, ESQ. re: #14 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/1/2019 BRYAN R. CAMPBELL, ESQ. (Law Firm: Cozen O'Connor) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY (jo)
February 27, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Re: ECF #14 - If the filing party has not already done so, please email a "Proposed Order" in word format to the applicable chambers email address. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders and LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations. (jo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice BRYAN R. CAMPBELL Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2163591.Michael F O'Connor appearing for Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Counsel)(O'Connor, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HP Inc. [RE: DEFENDANT HP INC.'S INITIAL DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FRCP 26(a)(1)] (Matayoshi, Jerold)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (O'Connor, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/8/2019. (jo)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order.Counsel Michael F O'Connor informs the Court of a possible mediation to be held with the parties in this case. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 02/11/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before JUDGE ALAN C. KAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/31/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 11/08/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 09/11/2019. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:36 - 9:40.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement [DEFENDANT HP INC.'S RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT]. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Matayoshi, Jerold)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Matayoshi, Jerold)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 DEFENDANT HP INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Matayoshi, Jerold)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (O'Connor, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Scheduling Conference Statement LR 16.2(B); CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (O'Connor, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii: Civil No. 18-1-1954-12 DEO. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re HAJIS, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint, #5 Return and Acknowledgment of Service, #6 Request for Exemption from CAAP, #7 Defendant HP's Notice of Filing re Notice of Removal) (jo)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 2/4/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00003 ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HP Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2138273), filed by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jerold T. Matayoshi, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Matayoshi, Jerold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. HP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael F O'Connor
Represented By: Bryan R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Inc.
Represented By: Gurudev Das Allin
Represented By: Jerold T. Matayoshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Individuals 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?