Khan v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Mary M Khan and Mary M. Khan
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00005
Filed: January 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Yee on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Yee, Harry)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Letter addressed to Diane C. Haar, Esq., attorney for plaintiff re: Transmission of documentation and forms for service relative to the Order granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis #7 . Service of letter and documentation to be executed via first class mail on Wednesday, January 9, 2019. (afc)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re: #6 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 1/8/2019. (afc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Diane C. Haar appearing for Plaintiff Mary M. Khan (Haar, Diane)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Department of Justice. (emt, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00005 ACK-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Haar, Diane)
January 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Mary M. Khan against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Mary M Khan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary M Khan
Represented By: Diane C. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary M. Khan
Represented By: Diane C. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Harry Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?