Siclot v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Nida Siclot
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00010
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Asim H. Modi on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Modi, Asim)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nida Siclot. Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beaver, Danielle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Moriyama on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Moriyama, Rachel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nida Siclot re #4 Summons Issued as to USA (Beaver, Danielle)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Department of Justice. (emt, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00010 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Beaver, Danielle)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2141008.), filed by Nida Siclot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaver, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siclot v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nida Siclot
Represented By: Danielle Rose Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Asim H. Modi
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?