Li vs. Sea Sky U.S.A., Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Haibin Li
Defendant: Sea Sky U.S.A., Inc., Jianhua Zhao and Does 1-50
Case Number: 1:2019cv00046
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 EO: In light of the #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 03/25/2019 IS VACATED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Haibin Li. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Egesdal, Steven)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jianhua Zhao served on 2/6/2019 filed by Haibin Li. (Egesdal, Steven) Modified to add served date to docket text on 2/7/2019 (cib).
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT VERIFIED against All Defendants, filed by Haibin Li. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Egesdal, Steven)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 3/25/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00046 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2147620.), filed by Haibin Li. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Egesdal, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li vs. Sea Sky U.S.A., Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haibin Li
Represented By: Steven M. Egesdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Sky U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jianhua Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?