Pakka v. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kaarina Pakka
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Kenneth Siegel, Apollo Global Management, LLC, Apollo Management VIII, L.P., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Members Association, Diamond Resorts Holdings, LLC, Michael Flaskey, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC and Club Operating Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00050
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 EO: In light of the #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, the Further Telephonic Status Conference Regarding Representation set for 06/07/2019 is hereby VACATED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal (Voluntary; Without Prejudice) Kaarina Pakka. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rufo, Sergio)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sergio Rufo on behalf of Kaarina Pakka on behalf of Kaarina Pakka. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rufo, Sergio)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Further Telephonic Status Conference Regarding Representation previously set for 06/04/2019 IS CONTINEUD TO 06/07/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.Prior to the hearing date, parties who wish to participate via telephone shall contact Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298 to notify the Court of the each parties telephonic participation. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 EP: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING REPRESENTATION held on 4/29/2019 - Also present is Michael L. Iosua appearing on behalf of Defendants Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Holdings, LLC, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC and Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Members Association. Specially appearing are Jorge Alvarez and Lydia Reynolds for Plaintiff Kaarina Pakka, Andrew Ehrlich for Defendant Apollo Management VIII, L.P. and John Delikanakis for Defendants Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Holdings, LLC, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc., Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC and Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Members Association.Discussion held regarding obtaining local counsel.Further Telephonic Status Conference Regarding Representation is set for June 4, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:31 - 9:37.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 25, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 9 EO permitted counsel from Nevada to participate at the April 29, 2019, 9 a.m. status conference by telephone was emailed to the following email addresses on April 25, 2019, at 12:30 p.m. HST: gma@albrightstoddard.com, dca@albrightstoddard.com, jalvarez@albrightstoddard.com, Kolker@whafh.com, Reynolds@whafh.com, adhalla@swlaw.com, jDelikanakis@swlaw.com, rsr@morrislawgroup.com, aehrlich@paulweiss.com, kammari@paulweiss.com, lclayton@paulweiss.com, rkravitz@paulweiss.com. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mansfield1)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 EO: For the limited purpose of assessing the status of this case, the Court permits the parties' counsel, licensed in Nevada, to participate by telephone at the 9:30 a.m., April 29, 2019 status conference. Participating counsel must email their email addresses to Mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov to receive telephone conference instructions from this Court no later than April 26, 2019, at 12:00 pm Hawaii Standard Time. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DUPLICATE ENTRY - SEE DOCUMENT #7 ORDER REGARDING CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, ECF #1 filed by Kaarina Pakka. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 01/28/2019. (apg, ) Modified on 1/28/2019- this entry was entered in error, please diregard and refer to document #7 (apg, ).
January 28, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #7 ORDER REGARDING CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT shall be served by First Class Mail to D. Chris Albright, Esq., G. Mark Albright, Esq., Aleem Dhalla, Esq. John S. Delikanakis, Esq. and Rosa Solis-Rainey, Esq. to the addresses of record on January 29, 2019. Additionally, copies of the Order shall be served by First Class Mail to the following attorneys, identified as admitted pro hac vice in Civil No. 2:18-cv-00247 APG-GWF on January 29, 2019 : Lawrence P. Koker, Esq., Lydia Keaney Reynolds, Esq., Andrew J. Ehlich, Esq., Kamil Ammari, Esq., Lewis R. Clayton, Esq. and Robert N. Kravitz, Esq. (emt, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re #1 - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/28/2019. The claims of Kaarina Pakka have been transferred to this court from the United States District Court, District of Nevada. Because none of Pakka's attorneys is a member of the bar of this court, those attorneys, if they wish to continue to represent Pakka in this case, must comply with Local Rule 83.1(e). Once Pakka is represented by counsel authorized to practice law before this court, the Class Action Complaint should be amended to reflect only the claims transferred to this court. (emt, )
January 28, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 3 Notice to Counsel and Non E-Filers, 4 Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Order Setting Status Conference were served by First Class Mail to D. Chris Albright, Esq., G. Mark Albright, Esq., Aleem Dhalla, Esq. John S. Delikanakis, Esq. and Rosa Solis-Rainey, Esq. to the addresses of record on January 28, 2019. Additionally, copies of the same documents were served by First Class Mail to the following attorneys, identified as admitted pro hac vice in Civil No. 2:18-cv-00247 APG-GWF: Lawrence P. Koker, Esq., Lydia Keaney Reynolds, Esq., Andrew J. Ehlich, Esq., Kamil Ammari, Esq., Lewis R. Clayton, Esq. and Robert N. Kravitz, Esq. A copy of Form HID007a-007a "Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Declaration of Counsel Package" was included in the mailing to all counsel. (emt, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/28/2019. Status Conference is set for 4/29/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00050 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND NON E-FILERS: The Clerk of Court for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii gives notice of its receipt of the Complaint (as to Plaintiff Kaarina Pakka, only) for Civil Case 2:18-cv-00247 APG-GWF; Joseph M. Dropp; et al. vs. Diamond Resorts International, Inc.; et al. , transferred from the U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada (Las Vegas). Please be advised that this case has been assigned to Senior U.S. District Judge Susan Oki Mollway and U.S. Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield. Accordingly, please reflect Civil Case Number: CV 19-00050 SOM-KJM on all further filings in this case. Submission of Pro Hac Vice Applications: Please refer to LR83.1(e) of the Local Rules for the District of Hawaii with respect to the submission of applications for pro hac vice admittance and the designation of local counsel (a member in good standing of the bar of this court who maintains an office within this district). The "Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Declaration of Counsel Package" (Form HID007-007a) is available on the court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov (see Forms section, subsection "Miscellaneous"). The filing fee is $300.00 per attorney, per case. On January 1, 2014, this court implemented mandatory electronic filing, see LR100.2.1. The Local Rules for the District of Hawaii, as well as information concerning CM/ECF registration are available on the court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov. (emt, )
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Complaint (2:18-cv-00247-APG-GWF) - Signed by DISTRICT JUDGE ANDREW P. GORDON on 1/25/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' motions to sever and transfer plaintiff Kaarina Pakka's claims (ECF Nos. 35, 36, 39, 40) are GRANTED. The clerk of court is instructed to transfer the complaint as to plaintiff Kaarina Pakka only to the United States District Court for the District of Hawai'i. (emt, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants - filed by Kaarina Pakka. [Pursuant to the Order entered on January 25, 2019, in Case Number 2:18-cv-00247 APG-GWF, Joseph M. Dropp, et al. vs. Diamond Resorts International, Inc.; et al., the Complaint, ONLY as to Plaintiff Kaarina Pakka, is transferred to the District of Hawaii.] (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pakka v. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc.
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Represented By: John S. Delikanakis
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Represented By: John S. Delikanakis
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Siegel
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Represented By: John S. Delikanakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Global Management, LLC
Represented By: Rosa Solis-Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Management VIII, L.P.
Represented By: Rosa Solis-Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Members Association
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Represented By: John S. Delikanakis
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Represented By: John S. Delikanakis
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Flaskey
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Represented By: John S. Delikanakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Corporation
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Represented By: John S. Delikanakis
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Represented By: John S. Delikanakis
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Club Operating Company
Represented By: Aleem Dhalla
Represented By: John S. Delikanakis
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaarina Pakka
Represented By: D. Chris Albright
Represented By: G. Mark Albright
Represented By: Sergio Rufo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?