Clayton; et al. v. PNC Bank, N.A.; et al.
Plaintiff: Raymond Benjamin Clayton and Allison Jeanene Branan
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association, Anne Elizabeth Rivera, Prospect Mortgage LLC, Jeffrey G. Agas, PNC Bank, N.A., Olegario Rivera, Doe Defendants 1-50, Jenelle R. Agas, Security National Mortgage Company and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00051
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 26 EP: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE held.Discussion held. Parties state their positions on settlement discussions.Counsel James J. Bickerton and Summer Kaiawe were excused.(SEALED 1:44 - 1:57)Initial settlement discussion held between the Court and PNC Bank with further discussions to be held next week.2:00 - 2:30Initial settlement discussion held with Plaintiff's counsel. (FTR-Ctrm C6 1:30 - 2:30.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
March 8, 2019 Filing 25 Plaintiff Raymond Benjamin Clayton's Reply to Defendants Jeffrey G. Agas and Jenelle R. Agas' Counterclaim ANSWER to #8 Defendants Jeffrey G. Agas and Jenelle R. Agas' Counterclaim, by Allison Jeanene Branan, Raymond Benjamin Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bickerton, James) Modified on 3/11/2019 (emt, ).
March 4, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: The Court continues the hearing on #14 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order of Remand to 5/16/2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Opposition is due April 11, 2019. Reply is due April 18, 2019 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)
March 4, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING: The Court sets a hearing on #14 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order of Remand at 10:00 AM on 4/3/2019, in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Opposition is due 3/18/2019. Reply is due 3/25/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO REID DAVIS re #17 , #18 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/1/2019. (emt, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BRETT J. NATARELLI re #20 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/1/2019. (emt, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Brett J. Natarelli. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2163961.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ARTHUR F. RADKE re #15 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/26/2019. (emt, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Corrective Entry,, Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Reid Davis Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund)
February 26, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY. The entry docket number #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Reid Davis] filed by PNC Bank, N.A. was filed incorrectly in this case. Counsel is advised to refer to page 6 of the Amended General Order Adopting Electronic Case Filing Procedures, Section 5 Signatures - "5.2 ECF Users Signature. The name of the ECF User under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by /s/ and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g. /s/ John Lawyer).." The filing party shall re-submit a corrected filing. (bbb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Reid Davis] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2163148.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund)
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 EP: STATUS CONFERENCE held. Arthur F. Radke, PHV counsel only in 1:19-cv-00006-JMS-KJM, via telephone. Discussion held regarding how the parties intend to proceed. Further Status Conference is set for March 15, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:15 - 9:33.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Arthur F. Radke Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2163015.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand James J. Bickerton appearing for Plaintiffs Allison Jeanene Branan, Raymond Benjamin Clayton, Counter Defendants Allison Jeanene Branan, Raymond Benjamin Clayton (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of James J. Bickerton, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Certificate of Compliance, #22 Certificate of Service)(Bickerton, James)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO RICHARD E. GOTTLIEB re #11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/22/2019. (emt, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 03/04/2019 at 9:30 a.m. has been advanced and converted into a Status Conference set for 02/25/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. At this time, the parties need not meet and confer nor file any conference statements. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Richard E. Gottlieb Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2160765.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new case number CV 19-00051 DKW-KJM on all future pleadings . (emt, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 EO: The Clerk's Office is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield will remain as the Magistrate Judge assigned to this action. (Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants Jeffrey G. Agas and Jenelle R. Agas' ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against PNC Bank, N.A., COUNTERCLAIM against Raymond Benjamin Clayton by Jeffrey G. Agas, Jenelle R. Agas. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim, #2 Crossclaim, #3 Certificate of Service)(Kaiawe, Summer)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants Olegario Rivera and Anne Elizabeth Rivera's ANSWER to Complaint filed December 18, 2018, CROSSCLAIM against PNC Bank, N.A., COUNTERCLAIM against Allison Jeanene Branan by Olegario Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim, #2 Crossclaim, #3 Certificate of Service)(Kaiawe, Summer)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. Do not e-file the Election Form. After completing the form, parties can either email it to consent@hid.uscourts.gov, or mail it to U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd., Room C-338, Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov. (jo)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 3/4/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00051 KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent PNC Financial Services Group for PNC Bank, National Association.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chun, Lauren)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by PNC Bank, National Association. (Chun, Lauren)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PNC Bank, National Association from Circuit Court of the Fifth Circuit, case number 18-1-0184. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2149219), filed by PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren K. Chun, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Certificate of Service)(Chun, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton; et al. v. PNC Bank, N.A.; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Lauren K. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Elizabeth Rivera
Represented By: Summer H. Kaiawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey G. Agas
Represented By: Summer H. Kaiawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brett J. Natarelli
Represented By: Reid Davis
Represented By: Lauren K. Chun
Represented By: Richard E. Gottlieb
Represented By: Edmund K. Saffery
Represented By: Arthur F. Radke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olegario Rivera
Represented By: Summer H. Kaiawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenelle R. Agas
Represented By: Summer H. Kaiawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security National Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Benjamin Clayton
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Jeanene Branan
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?