Campos vs. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: John Campos
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00071
Filed: February 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re #14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS and service documents). Mail sent to Harvey P. Sackett, Esq. at 1055 Lincoln Ave., P. O. Box 5025, San Jose, CA 95150-5025 returned undeliverable. On April 3, 2019, the Clerk's Office resent the documents to Harvey P. Sackett, Esq. at Sackett and Associates, APLC, 1055 Lincoln Ave., San Jose, CA 95125. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Office Letter dated March 8, 2019, #2 Order Granting Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (certified copy), #3 Amended Complaint (3 certified copies), #4 Summons (issued), #5 Civil Waiver of Service Packet (3 copies), #6 USM-285 forms (3 copies)) (emt, )
March 31, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey P. Sackett on behalf of John Campos on behalf of John Campos. (Sackett, Harvey)
March 8, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a certified copy of #14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS has been served by First Class Mail to Harvey P. Sackett, Esq., counsel for John Campos at the address of record on March 8, 2019. Additionally, the following documents and forms were included in the mailing to Mr. Sackett: Copies of the Amended Complaint, the Issued Summons and the Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons (AO 398 form), Waiver of Service of Summons forms (AO 399) with instructions (Notice to Parties) and USM-285 forms. A certified copy of the #14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS was served to the U.S. Marshals Service through interoffice delivery on March 8, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from the Clerk's Office to Harvey P. Sackett, Esq., re ECF No. #14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, dated March 8, 2019. (emt, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (emt, )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #2 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/8/2019. (emt, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO HARVEY P. SACKETT re #8 , #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/5/2019. (emt, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice HARVEY P. SACKETT Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2155755. , #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice HARVEY P. SACKETT Filing f Jennifer B. Lyons appearing for Plaintiff John Campos (Lyons, Jennifer)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 EO: The #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice HARVEY P. SACKETT is terminated. An Amended Pro Hac Vice Motion was filed on 2/18/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 EO: #8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice HARVEY P. SACKETT is terminated. An Amended Pro Hac Vice Motion was filed on 2/18/19 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice HARVEY P. SACKETT Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2155755. , #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice HARVEY P. SACKETT Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2155755. Jennifer B. Lyons appearing for Plaintiff John Campos (Lyons, Jennifer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice HARVEY P. SACKETT Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2155755. Jennifer B. Lyons appearing for Plaintiff John Campos (Lyons, Jennifer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF DECISION OF COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Administrative Procedure Act Case) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by John Campos.(Lyons, Jennifer)
February 11, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The #1 Complaint and #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice HARVEY P. SACKETT Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2155755. filed by John Campos were filed incorrectly in this case. Please be advised of the following: 1) The Complaint is not signed by the e-filer, Jennifer Lyons, Esq. The filing party may refer to LR100.5.1., which states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g. /s/ John or Jane Lawyer)." 2) The Declaration of Counsel submitted in support of the Motion for Pro Hac Vice does not bear the scanned image of Mr. Sackett's signature. The filing party may refer to LR100.5.2. which states "An electronically filed document requiring the original, wet signature of an individual other than the CM/ECF user, such as an affidavit or declaration, must contain the original or a scanned image of that individual's signature." (emt, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00071 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 11, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #5 Letter, was filed incorrectly in this case. The Clerk's Office will reenter the Letter in the appropriate case. Please disregard the entry. (emt, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Letter addressed to Judge Derrick K. Watson from Samuel P. Shnider, Esq., dated February 8, 2019 Re: Request to appear by telephone at hearing on Legacy Developments, LLC and Emily Bowden's Second Motion to Dismiss and Joinder in Defendants Maui Process Services, LLC and Christopher Williams's Motion to Dismiss, scheduled for hearing on February 15, 2019. (emt, ) Modified on 2/11/2019 (emt, ).
February 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Lyons, Jennifer)
February 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice HARVEY P. SACKETT Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2155755.Jennifer B. Lyons appearing for Plaintiff John Campos (Lyons, Jennifer)
February 10, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Jennifer B. Lyons appearing for Plaintiff John Campos (Lyons, Jennifer)
February 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF DECISION OF COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Administrative Procedure Act Case) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by John Campos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Jennifer) Modified on 2/11/2019 The Complaint is signed /s/ Harvey P. Sackett (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos vs. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Campos
Represented By: Jennifer B. Lyons
Represented By: Harvey P. Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?