Slezak v. Subaru Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Richard Slezak
Defendant: Subaru of America, Does 1-25 and Subaru Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00082
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 EO: In light of the #7 Order, allowing Plaintiff until April 30, 2019 to file an amended complaint, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 04/15/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 05/30/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements, in not already filed, are due by 05/23/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (1) GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS; AND (2) DISMISSING COMPLAINT IN PART WITH PARTIAL LEAVE TO AMEND re #1 , #6 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/28/2019. Slezak's application to proceed in forma pauperis, Dkt. No. 6, is GRANTED. The Complaint, Dkt. No. 1, is DISMISSED IN PART WITH PARTIAL LEAVE TO AMEND as set forth herein. Slezak may have until April 30, 2019 to file an amended complaint. The Court cautions Slezak that failure to file an amended complaint by April 30, 2019 may result in the dismissal of those claims that the Court has dismissed without prejudice in this Order. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Richard Slezak served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on March 28, 2019.
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Richard Slezak. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES re #4 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/27/2019. Slezak must fully complete and sign the Court's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, which will be sent to Slezak with this Order, or pay the civil filing fees in full by March 14, 2019. Failure to do so will result in automatic dismissal of this action. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Slezak a blank Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 240) and the accompanying instruction sheet so that he may comply with this Order. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Richard Slezak shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on February 28, 2019. A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs form shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Slezak.
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Waiver of Court Fees - by Plaintiff Richard Slezak. (emt, )
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/15/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Intake Staff mailed a copy of the Order to Plaintiff Richard Slezak on February 14, 2019.
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/14/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Intake Staff mailed a copy of the Order to Plaintiff Richard Slezak on February 14, 2019.
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: BREACH OF CONTRACT; Request for Jury Trial against All Defendants - filed by Richard Slezak. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slezak v. Subaru Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Slezak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?