Igarashi et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Igarashi, Clyde Igarashi and Does 10 through 1000
Defendant: Homeward Residential, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, MERSCORP, Doe Partnerships 1-10, OneWest Bank, FSB, John Does 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Doe Corporations 1-10, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. and CIT Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00083
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE - Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michelle Igarashi, Clyde Igarashi as to Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14. (emt, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Igarashi, Clyde Igarashi. Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14 served on 3/20/2019. (emt, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #29 Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Merscorp, Homeward Residential Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, and Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed herein on February 14, 2019 [ECF No. 1]:Motion Hearing is SET for 6/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (shm)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 27, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Filed Herein on February 14, 2019 Thomas Johannes Berger appearing for Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Homeward Residential, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., MERSCORP, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support , #2 Declaration of Thomas J. Berger , #3 Exhibit A: Complaint state court, #4 Exhibit B: Mortgage, #5 Exhibit C: Assignment of Mortgage, #6 Exhibit D: State court docket as of March 27, 2019, #7 Certificate of Service)(Berger, Thomas) Modified on 3/28/2019 (emt, ).
March 27, 2019 Filing 28 EO: By joint agreement of the parties, due to scheduling conflicts, a request to continue is GRANTED. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 04/15/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 05/14/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 05/07/2019. Parties have been notified. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 20, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Igarashi, Clyde Igarashi. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust served on 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
March 15, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of the 26 EO will be served by First Class Mail to Clyde Igarashi and Michelle Igarashi at their address of record on 03/18/2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mansfield2)
March 15, 2019 Filing 26 EO: On March 14, 2019, Defendants Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., MERSCORP, Homeward Residential, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, and Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. (collectively, the "Deutsche Bank Defendants") filed the #21 Ex Parte Motion for First Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint Filed February 14, 2019 [ECF No. 1] ("Ex Parte Motion"). The Ex Parte Motion asks the Court to extend the Deutsche Bank Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint from March 14, 2019 to March 27, 2019. The Deutsche Bank Defendants represent that Plaintiff Clyde Igarashi agreed to their request for an extension. See ECF No. 21-1 at 3 (citing ECF No. 21-3).For good cause shown, and given the lack of opposition, the Court GRANTS the Ex Parte Motion. The Deutsche Bank Defendants' new deadline to respond to the Complaint is March 27, 2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 03/15/2019. (mansfield2)
March 15, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W.Y. Lai on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lai, Jonathan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, Homeward Residential, Inc., MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Iwabuchi, Naomi)
March 15, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Naomi Iwabuchi on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, Homeward Residential, Inc., MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, Homeward Residential, Inc., MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Iwabuchi, Naomi)
March 15, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Re: The entry docket number #22 Notice of Appearance filed by Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., MERSCORP, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, Homeward Residential, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation ~ Please be advised that the Notice of Appearance reflects the appearances of both Jonathan W. Y. Lai, Esq. and Thomas J. Berger, Esq. It is recommended that each attorney file a Notice of Appearance, using their respective CM/ECF Login credentials to properly associate themselves to the case. (emt, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Johannes Berger on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, Homeward Residential, Inc., MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, Homeward Residential, Inc., MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. (Berger, Thomas)
March 14, 2019 Filing 21 EX PARTE Motion FOR FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT FILED FEBRUARY 14, 2019 [ECF No. 1] Thomas Johannes Berger appearing for Defendants Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14, MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Thomas J. Berger , #3 Exhibit A , #4 Certificate of Service)(Berger, Thomas) Modified on 3/15/2019 (emt, ).
March 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #18 Defendant Cit Bank, N.A., f/k/a Onewest Bank N.A., f/k/a Onewest Bank, FSB's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 1] Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed February 14, 2019:Motion Hearing is set for 6/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (shm)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy A. Tanaka on behalf of CIT Bank, N.A. on behalf of CIT Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tanaka, Judy)
March 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Jenny Nakamoto appearing for Defendant CIT BANK, N.A., f/k/a ONEWEST BANK N.A., f/k/a ONEWEST BANK, FSB (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Nakamoto, Jenny)
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIT BANK, N.A., f/k/a ONEWEST BANK N.A., f/k/a ONEWEST BANK, FSB. (Nakamoto, Jenny)
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OneWest Bank, FSB. (Nakamoto, Jenny)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Igarashi, Clyde Igarashi. Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. served on 2/21/2019. (emt, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Igarashi, Clyde Igarashi. OneWest Bank, FSB served on 2/20/2019. (emt, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Igarashi, Clyde Igarashi. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company served on 2/21/2019. (emt, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Igarashi, Clyde Igarashi. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 2/22/2019. (emt, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14. (emt, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to OneWest Bank, FSB. (emt, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (emt, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Financial Corporation. (emt, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. (emt, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (as trustee for Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14). (emt, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (emt, )
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/15/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI025831 re #1 Complaint. (emt, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Clyde Igarashi, Michelle Igarashi. (emt, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Clyde Igarashi, Michelle Igarashi. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Summons - not issued, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Igarashi et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeward Residential, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Johannes Berger
Represented By: Naomi Iwabuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Johannes Berger
Represented By: Naomi Iwabuchi
Represented By: Jonathan W.Y. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Johannes Berger
Represented By: Naomi Iwabuchi
Represented By: Jonathan W.Y. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP
Represented By: Thomas Johannes Berger
Represented By: Naomi Iwabuchi
Represented By: Jonathan W.Y. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB
Represented By: Jenny Nakamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-14
Represented By: Thomas Johannes Berger
Represented By: Naomi Iwabuchi
Represented By: Jonathan W.Y. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Thomas Johannes Berger
Represented By: Naomi Iwabuchi
Represented By: Jonathan W.Y. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Johannes Berger
Represented By: Naomi Iwabuchi
Represented By: Jonathan W.Y. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Johannes Berger
Represented By: Naomi Iwabuchi
Represented By: Jonathan W.Y. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIT Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jenny Nakamoto
Represented By: Judy A. Tanaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Igarashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Igarashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Does 10 through 1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?