Conklin v. Espinda et al
Plaintiff: Craig Laurence Conklin
Defendant: Dr. Toyama, Lyle Antonio, Dovie Borgess, Dr. Frauens, Dr. Yoo, Nolan Espinda, Dr. Gary Saldona, Francis Mufao, Norma Nishimoto, John Doe 2, John Does 3-38, Captain Snook, Mahina Assily, Inmate Tupuelo and John Doe 1
Interested Party: Laurie Nadamoto and Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2019cv00087
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 Partial Civil Filing Fee: $ 18.00; receipt number HI026017 re #1 Complaint (jo)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re: #3 "Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED without prejudice to refiling it after the court has screened the Complaint, ordered it served, and Defendants have filed an Answer or other response." Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/8/2019. (jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants will be served on March 11, 2019 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re: #2 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/8/2019. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of ServiceOrder served electronically via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF): Financial Department, USDC District of Hawaii, and Shelley Harrington, Esq. and Laurie Nadamoto, Esq., Hawaii Department of Public Safety Litigation Coordinators. A copy of the instant Order will be served on March 8, 2019, by First Class Mail addressed to: Craig Laurence Conklin A5021908HALAWA CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 99-902 Moanalua Rd Aiea, HI 96701 HALAWA CORRECTIONAL FACILITY Attn: WARDEN 99-902 Moanalua Rd Aiea, HI 96701 HALAWA CORRECTIONAL FACILITYAttn: Financial Office 99-902 Moanalua Rd Aiea, HI 96701
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL - by Plaintiff Craig Laurence Conklin (jo)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BY A PRISONER - by Plaintiff Craig Laurence Conklin (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants - filed by Plaintiff Craig Laurence Conklin (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conklin v. Espinda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Toyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovie Borgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Frauens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan Espinda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gary Saldona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Mufao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Nishimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 3-38
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Snook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahina Assily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate Tupuelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Laurence Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?