UN4 Productions, Inc. v. Doe

Plaintiff: UN4 Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00092
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 EO: In light of the Court's Order Granting Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, the Court finds good cause to extend the time for service up to and including June 26, 2019, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Further, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued from April 19, 2019, to July 25, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE re #7 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 2/25/2019. (emt, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE Motion FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff UN4 Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Culpepper, Kerry)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by UN4 Productions, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Amended Exhibit 1. (Culpepper, Kerry)
February 22, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #1 Complaint - Exhibit 1, filed by UN4 Productions, Inc. is illegible. Plaintiff's Counsel is to refile a legible exhibit 1 as an amended document and link it to the complaint. (cib)
February 22, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint, #5 Set Rule 16 Scheduling Conference has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of Register of Copyrights, Washington D.C. 20559. (cib)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 4/19/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00092-SOM-RLP on all further pleadings. (cib)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UN4 Productions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for UN4 Productions, Inc... (Culpepper, Kerry)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by UN4 Productions, Inc. UN4 Productions, Inc.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2162094.), filed by UN4 Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UN4 Productions, Inc. v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UN4 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?