Kealakai v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Keneke Kealakai
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00143
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY.(cib)
May 2, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that document #14 requires the judges signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in word format to the applicable chambers email address. The filing party may referto LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (cib)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Keneke Kealakai. (Brackett, Justin)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 EO: On 4/17/19, Plaintiff Keneke Kealakai, through his counsel Justin A. Brackett, Esq., filed a Notice of Settlement, requesting that the Court vacate all dates set on calendar and give the parties 30 days to file a stipulation of dismissal [ECF No. 12]. In light of the Notice, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file and submit to District Judge Mollway's Orders Inbox a stipulation of dismissal that is signed by all parties that have appeared and remain in this case by no later than May 20, 2019. The Rule 16 scheduling conference scheduled for 5/20/19 at 9:00 a.m. is continued to 6/20/19 at 9:00 a.m. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/20/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Keneke Kealakai of Settlement and Certificate of Service Keneke Kealakai. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brackett, Justin)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Velocity Investments, LLC. served on 3/25/2019 filed by by Keneke Kealakai. (Brackett, Justin) Modified on 3/28/2019 to add service date.
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new case number CV 19-00143 SOM-RT on all future pleadings (emt, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 EO: The Court directs the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Magistrate Judge Trader will remain as the Magistrate Judge on this case. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Velocity Investments, LLC. (emt, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. Do not e-file the Election Form. After completing the form, parties can either email it to consent@hid.uscourts.gov, or mail it to U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd., Room C-338, Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov (emt, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/20/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00143 RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Velocity Investments, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2174623.), filed by Keneke Kealakai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration Verification of Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kealakai v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keneke Kealakai
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?