Larson v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Lonnie E. Larson
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and John/Jane Does I-X
Case Number: 1:2019cv00150
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lonnie E. Larson for Rule 26(f) Initial Disclosure Statement (Vandeveer, Timothy)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 6/27/2019. (emt, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 EP: Telephone Status Conference to Reschedule the Trial - Discussion held.Jury Selection/Trial set for 7/6/20 @ 9:00 a.m. is continued to 8/10/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Otake.The Early Settlement Conference set for 1/7/20 @ 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader and the Settlement Conference set for 3/9/20 @ 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader will remain as scheduled.Court to issue an Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/11/2020. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/30/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 8/10/2020 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Settlement Conference is set for 1/7/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 3/9/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 EO: Pursuant to Tim Vandeveer's request, and by agreement of counsel, a Telephone Status Conference to Reschedule the Trial is set for 6/27/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Counsel to provide their telephone number to the CRM, Toni Fujinaga, at 541-129. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 6/3/2019. (jo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Discussion held.Parties agree that initial disclosures will be due 30 days from today.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 7/6/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Otake.An Early Settlement Conference is set for 1/7/20 @ 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Confidential settlement conference letters are due by 12/31/19.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 7/6/2020 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/26/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 1/7/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 3/9/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/5/2020. Discovery due by 5/8/2020. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 EO: Reid Winthrop is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/19 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sia, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement by Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sia, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sia, Jeffrey)
May 27, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff Lonnie E. Larson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service CS Scheduling Conference Statement)(Vandeveer, Timothy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Based on Plaintiff's representations in his #10 Response to Order to Show Cause, the Court takes no further action on the Order to Show Cause issued on 4/1/19. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion Order to Show Cause filed by Lonnie E. Larson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Declaration Declaration of Lonnie E. Larson, #9 Declaration Declaration of Timothy Vandeveer, #10 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Vandeveer, Timothy)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REID A. WINTHROP TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #7 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/4/2019. (emt, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 4/2/2019. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff must file a response to this Order to Show Cause by April 15, 2019, identifying his citizenship, as well as the state of incorporation and principal place of business for Defendant. Failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in a finding that Plaintiff has failed to carry his burden of establishing subject matter jurisdiction and the Court will dismiss the action without prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 4/15/2019. (emt, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2177316.Margaret Dunham Wille appearing for Plaintiff Lonnie E. Larson (Wille, Margaret)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Dunham Wille on behalf of Lonnie E. Larson on behalf of Lonnie E. Larson. (Wille, Margaret)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Lonnie E. Larson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attorneys of Record)(Vandeveer, Timothy)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/3/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00150 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2176460.), filed by Lonnie E. Larson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Larson Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #1, #3 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #2, #4 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #3, #5 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #4, #6 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #5, #7 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #6, #8 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #7, #9 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #8, #10 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #9, #11 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #10, #12 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #11, #13 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #12, #14 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #13, #15 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #14, #16 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #15, #17 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #16, #18 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #17, #19 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #18, #20 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #19, #21 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #20, #22 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #21, #23 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #22, #24 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #23, #25 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #24, #26 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #25, #27 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #26, #28 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #27, #29 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #28, #30 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #29, #31 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #30, #32 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #31, #33 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #32, #34 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #33, #35 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #34, #36 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #35, #37 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #36, #38 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #37, #39 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #38, #40 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #39, #41 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #40, #42 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #41, #43 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #42, #44 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #43, #45 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #44, #46 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #45, #47 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #46, #48 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #47, #49 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #48, #50 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #49, #51 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #50, #52 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #51, #53 Exhibit Larson Exhibit #52)(Vandeveer, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey H.K. Sia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie E. Larson
Represented By: Timothy A Vandeveer
Represented By: Reid A. Winthrop
Represented By: Margaret Dunham Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?