Layton Construction Company v. Lexington Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Layton Construction Company, LLC
Defendant: Doe's 1-10, North American Elite Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00154
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL CLAIMS AND ALL PARTIES by Layton Construction Company, LLC - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. The stipulation is entered into and filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and District of Hawaii Local Rule 41.1. No claims or parties remain. (emt, )
April 18, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the entry docket number #8 Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to All Claims and All Parties filed by Layton Construction Company, LLC shall be submitted for consideration to Judge Jill A. Otake at otake_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (emt, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL CLAIMS AND ALL PARTIES by Layton Construction Company, LLC. (Osterkamp, Jeffrey)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii; CV 19-1-0203-02 DEO. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Complaint; Exhibit A; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons, #4 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (Re: Ace American Insurance Company), #5 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (Re: Lexington Insurance Company), #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit 1; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Lexington Insurance Company. (Monlux, Nicholas)
March 27, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. On the notice of removal pleading filed by Lexington Insurance Company, Attorney's Nicholas R. Monlux and Davd M. Louie are listed as representing all defendants. Counsel only represents Defendant Lexington Insurance Company re #1 . (cib)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 4/29/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00154-JAO-RT on all further pleadings (cib)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lexington Insurance Company from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 19-1-0203-02. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2176862), filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas R. Monlux, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas) Modified on 3/28/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Layton Construction Company v. Lexington Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe's 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Elite Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layton Construction Company, LLC
Represented By: David Schulmeister
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Osterkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?