Flores v. MNS, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Leah Flores
Defendant: MNS, Ltd., Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Unigroup Wholesale Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00159
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/11/2019. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 07/13/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 06/02/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 10/15/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 04/01/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 02/12/2020. Discovery due by 05/15/2020. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:00 - 9:08.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
July 4, 2019 Filing 25 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hu, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 Scheduling Conference Statement of MNS, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marsh, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Kandel, Alexander)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT UNIGROUP WHOLESALE INC.; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/2/2019. Attorney David Geoffrey Brittin for MNS, Ltd. Attorneys Randall Y. Yamamoto and Jeffrey Hu for Unigroup Wholesale Inc. added. Attorney Michael R. Marsh terminated for Unigroup Wholesale Inc. (emt, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 EO: Plaintiff's local counsel requests to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to allow parties more time to meet and confer. Request is hereby GRANTED. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/03/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 07/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 07/04/2019. Mainland counsel may participate via telephone by notifying Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's Courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298 of their participation and for call-in instructions, prior to the hearing date. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MNS, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marsh, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unigroup Wholesale Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marsh, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MNS, Ltd., Unigroup Wholesale Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marsh, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO FARHAD NOVIAN re #14 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/17/2019. (emt, )
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ALEXANDER KANDEL re #13 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/17/2019. (emt, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 Filing fee: $ 600 ($300/per attorney), receipt number HI026248 re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Alexander Kandel Filing fee $ 300., #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Farhad Novian Filing fee $ 300. (emt, )
April 16, 2019 PAYMENT of Fees - Payment Pro Hac Vice Application re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Alexander Kandel Filing fee $ 300. Filing fee $ 300.. (Yee, Allison) Modified on 4/17/2019 (emt, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Farhad Novian Filing fee $ 300 (receipt #: HI026248) . Allison G. Yee appearing for Plaintiff Leah Flores (Yee, Allison) Modified on 4/17/2019 (emt, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Alexander Kandel Filing fee $ 300 (receipt #: HI026248) Allison G. Yee appearing for Plaintiff Leah Flores (Yee, Allison) Modified on 4/17/2019 (emt, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Flores. Unigroup Wholesale Inc. served on 4/8/2019 . (Yee, Allison) Modified on 4/17/2019 (emt, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Flores. MNS, Ltd. served on 4/8/2019 . (Yee, Allison) Modified on 4/17/2019 (emt, ).
April 16, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #10 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright and #1 Complaint, have been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights at U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independent Ave., S.E., Washington, DC 20559-6000 on April 16, 2019. (emt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Leah Flores Report on Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal re A Copyright Leah Flores. (Yee, Allison)
April 1, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Notice to Non E-Filer, 2 Notice of Case Assignment has been served by First Class Mail to Robert E. Chapman, Esq. at the address of record on April 1, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
April 1, 2019 NOTICE TO NON E-FILER : The Clerk's Office will no longer serve the attorneys at Clay Chapman Iwamura Pulice & Nervell via both paper and electronic service. Beginning with the email service of document number 2 Notice of Case Assignment, the Clerk's Office will only serve Clay Chapman Iwamura Pulice & Nervell electronically to the email addresses of record in this case. (emt, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the U.S. Copyright Office. (cib)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MNS, Ltd., Unigroup Wholesale Inc. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons Unigroup Wholesale)(cib)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 6/3/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Yee, Allison)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Yee, Allison)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Leah Flores. (Yee, Allison)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00159-JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement; Vicarious and/or Contributory Copyright Infringement against MNS, Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400.00. Receipt 0975-2178554), filed by LEAH FLORES.(Yee, Allison) Modified on 4/3/2019 to add receipt number to docket entry (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. MNS, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNS, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael R. Marsh
Represented By: David Geoffrey Brittin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unigroup Wholesale Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Marsh
Represented By: Jeffrey Hu
Represented By: Randall Y. Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Flores
Represented By: Allison G. Yee
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Robert E. Chapman
Represented By: Alexander Kandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?