Paredes vs. USA
Plaintiff: Kenette A Paredes and Edgard Paredes, SR.
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10, Roe Governmental Entities 1-10, Doe Partnerships, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, United States of America and Doe Corporations 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00161
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/8/2019. (cib)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Rule 16 Scheduling Order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/8/2019. (cib)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 7/8/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 7/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 4/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements by 4/07/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/12/2020. Discovery due by 5/15/2020. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:30 a.m. - 9:40 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Re: Defendant USA's Initial Disclosures (Butler, Jeremy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement ; COS. (Butler, Jeremy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Kenette A Paredes. (Sonson, Alex)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiffs Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; Non-Jury Demand.. (Sonson, Alex) Modified on 7/8/2019 to add non jury demand to docket text. (cib).
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Kenette A Paredes.(Sonson, Alex)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Kenette A Paredes. (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Main Document)(Sonson, Alex)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy J. Butler on behalf of United States of America on behalf of United States of America. (Butler, Jeremy)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00161SOM-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019 ). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 05/08/2019. (apg, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2019 is CONTINUED to 7/8/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI) (agh)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 5/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00161 SOM-RLP on all further pleadings. (jo)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Kenette A Paredes ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2178770.), filed by Kenette A Paredes.(Sonson, Alex) Docket Text Modified on 4/1/2019 (jo)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Kenette A Paredes. (Sonson, Alex)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET COMPLAINT against by Kenette A Paredes ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2178754.), filed by Kenette A Paredes.(Sonson, Alex) Docket Text Modified on 4/1/2019 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paredes vs. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenette A Paredes
Represented By: Alex M. Sonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgard Paredes, SR.
Represented By: Alex M. Sonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jeremy J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?