Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds v. Zoe Builders Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds, Pensioned Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmative Action Training Fund, Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund, Hawaii Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Operating Engineers Industry Stabilization Trust Fund and Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Zoe Builders Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00163
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
2 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/28/2019. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties to this matter are hereby ORDERED TO APPEAR for a settlement conference, beginning in Chambers, on January 23, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. In addition to the lead counsel, each party or a designated representative with final settlement authority, must personally attend the settlement conference. (emt, )
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/28/2019. (emt, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held in chambers. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued.Discussion held. Non-Jury Trial is set for 5/26/2020 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE.Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/15/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/26/2019. Discovery due by 3/27/2020. (Court Reporter no reporter.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(shm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Chang, Jerry)
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Zoe Builders Inc.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wesley-Smith, Ian)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian R. Wesley-Smith on behalf of Zoe Builders Inc. on behalf of Zoe Builders Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wesley-Smith, Ian)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING. (Chang, Jerry)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00163-JAO-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/08/2019 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 05/08/2019. (apg, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds re #8 Request Withdrawal of Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Zoe Builders, Inc., a Hawaii corporation Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant Zoe Builders Inc.'s Answer to Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages Filed April 1, 2019 [Doc 1] ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Zoe Builders Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Manaut, John)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST Entry of Default by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF ASHLEY K. IKEDA, #2 Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Entry of Default)(Ikeda, Ashley)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds. Zoe Builders Inc. served on 4/16/2019. All Defendants. (Chang, Jerry) Modified on 4/23/2019 (emt, ).
April 1, 2019 PAYMENT of Fees - Payment for Complaint re #1 Complaint, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0975-2179625.. (Chang, Jerry)
April 1, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the civil filing fee re docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds may be submitted by selecting the filing event "Payment of Fees" from the "Other Documents" filing category. (emt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Zoe Builders Inc. (emt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00163 JAO-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds. (Chang, Jerry)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Zoe Builders Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0975-2179625. ), filed by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Chang, Jerry) Modified on 4/2/2019 to add receipt number (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds v. Zoe Builders Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Trust Funds
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeyman Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Operating Engineers Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Industry Stabilization Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoe Builders Inc.
Represented By: John P. Manaut
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?