Chavera v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Randy A. Chavera
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00164
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Randy A. Chavera CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Williams, Allen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Randy A. Chavera CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Williams, Allen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Randy A. Chavera CERTICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Williams, Allen)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/6/2019. (emt, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order. Non-Jury Trial is set for 05/04/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 03/24/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 02/07/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/04/2019. Discovery due by 03/06/2020. If the parties so wish to hold an Early Settlement Conference with the Court, they may do so by contacting Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfields Courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:47 - 9:49.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harada-Stone, David)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Williams, Allen)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Harada-Stone, David)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Harada-Stone, David)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/6/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00164 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Fifth Circuit Court, case number 19-1-0027. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2179962), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Harada-Stone, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavera v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: David R. Harada-Stone
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy A. Chavera
Represented By: Allen K. Williams
Represented By: Collin Marty Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?