Roberts vs. Connors; et al.
Plaintiff: Andrew Namiki Roberts
Defendant: Clare E. Connors and Al Cummings
Case Number: 1:2019cv00165
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 EP: Telephonic Settlement on the Record held on 7/12/2019. Counsel states the key terms on the record. The Court finds that the parties have entered into a valid and enforceable settlement. Stipulation for Dismissal shall be submitted to watson_orders@hid.uscourts by August 12, 2019. All dates and deadlines, including trial, are VACATED. (Court Reporter FTR - C7. 8:20 a.m. - 8:23 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 EO: A telephonic Settlement on the Record is set for 7/12/2019 at 08:15 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - RFA in Electric Arms Case, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/14/2019. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties to this matter are hereby ORDERED TO APPEAR for a settlement conference, beginning in chambers, on February 27, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. In addition to the lead counsel, each party or a designated representative with final settlement authority, must personally attend the settlement conference. (emt, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/14/2019. (emt, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 6/14/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 6/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements by 2/20/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/15/2020. Discovery due by 4/17/2020. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:15 a.m. - 9:35 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement by Clare E. Connors and Al Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing on 165 Defendant Clare E. Connors and Al Cummings' Motion To Dismiss or For Other Appropriate Relief set for 9/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tyk)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss John M. Cregor, Jr appearing for Defendants Al Cummings, Clare E. Connors (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cregor, John)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 EO: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2019 is CONTINUED to 6/14/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case Please reflect new case number CV 19-00165DKW-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019 ). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 05/08/2019. (apg, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Based on counsel's request and agreement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2019 is CONTINUED to 6/5/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI) (agh)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Namiki Roberts. All Defendants. Al Cummings served on 4/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Proof on SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Clare Connors. Clare Connors served on 4/4/2019. )(Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 4/10/2019 (emt, ).
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATION OF STEPHEN D. STAMBOULIEH TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 4/4/2019. (emt, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2180862.Alan A. Beck appearing for Plaintiff Andrew Namiki Roberts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beck, Alan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Al Cummings. (emt, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Clare E. Connors. (emt, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00165 DKW-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) as to Al Cummings (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Proposed) Summons as to Clare E. Connors )(Beck, Alan) Modified on 4/3/2019 (emt, ).
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Clare E. Connors, Al Cummings ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2180172.), filed by Andrew Namiki Roberts , Al Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beck, Alan) Modified on 4/3/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts vs. Connors; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare E. Connors
Represented By: John M. Cregor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Cummings
Represented By: John M. Cregor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Namiki Roberts
Represented By: Alan A. Beck
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?