Aspen American Insurance Company v. Wynn et al

Plaintiff: Aspen American Insurance Company
Defendant: James Baker and Deborah Wynn
Case Number: 1:2019cv00180
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aspen American Insurance Company. James Baker waiver sent on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Farias, Cynthia)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aspen American Insurance Company. Deborah Wynn waiver sent on 5/3/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Farias, Cynthia)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - not held. No defense counsel present.Ms. Farias informed the Court that the complaint was not served, and that the defendants have moved to the mainland. Ms. Farias was retained to file the complaint, and this case may be moved to Florida.A Status Conference is set for 8/6/19 @ 9:00 a.m. Status Conference is set for 8/6/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aspen American Insurance Company. (Farias, Cynthia)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. Do not e-file the Election Form. After completing the form, parties can either email it to consent@hid.uscourts.gov, or mail it to U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd., Room C-338, Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov The party filing the case or removal is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice and the attached Election Form. (emt, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/3/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00180 RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2182975.), filed by Aspen American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farias, Cynthia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspen American Insurance Company v. Wynn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen American Insurance Company
Represented By: Cynthia A. Farias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?