Stephenson v. Jocor Enterprises LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Stephenson, III
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America, Jocor Enterprises LLC and Sony Electronics Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00181
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Miyashita, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Filing 21 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MacLaren, Alexander)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendants Sony Electronics Inc. and Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ma, Stacy)
June 20, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. No further action necessary. - Document Not Signed - Please be advised that document #19 is not signed. The filing party may refer to LR100.5.1., which states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g. /s/ John or Jane Lawyer)". (cib)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Planning Meeting of the Parties. (Craig, Sara)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 07/02/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 07/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 07/10/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation, Corporate Parent Sony Corporation of America for Sony Electronics Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Sony Corporation of America.. (Young, Calvin)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Certificate of Service by Sony Corporation of America.(Ma, Stacy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sony Electronics Inc..(Ma, Stacy)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jocor Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MacLaren, Alexander)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jocor Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MacLaren, Alexander)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 EO: Pursuant to the parties' request, and to allow the defendants sufficient time to respond to the Complaint, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/03/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 07/02/2019, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 06/25/2019.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield2)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sony Electronics Inc served on 4/24/2019 filed by John Stephenson, III.. (Miyashita, Robert) Modified on 4/30/2019 to add service date to docket text (cib).
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jocor Enterprises LLC served on 4/25/2019 filed by John Stephenson, III. (Miyashita, Robert) Modified on 4/30/2019 to add service date to docket text (cib).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachel Abrams as to Plaintiff John Stephenson, III re #7 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/10/2019. (cib)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice Sara Craig as to Plaintiff John Stephenson, III re #6 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/10/2019. (cib)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Rachel Abrams Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2183225.Robert Saburo Miyashita appearing for Plaintiff John Stephenson, III (Miyashita, Robert)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Sara Craig Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2183215.Robert Saburo Miyashita appearing for Plaintiff John Stephenson, III (Miyashita, Robert)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 6/3/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00181 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings.(jo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2183091.), filed by John Stephenson, III. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miyashita, Robert) Docket Text Modified on 4/8/2019 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson v. Jocor Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stephenson, III
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Robert Saburo Miyashita
Represented By: Sara Craig
Represented By: Rachel Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Represented By: Stacy Y Ma
Represented By: Calvin E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocor Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Alexander T. MacLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc.
Represented By: Stacy Y Ma
Represented By: Calvin E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?