United States of America v. Jaques
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Donna M. Jaques
Case Number: 1:2019cv00184
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 EO: Pursuant to Charles Duffy's request, the #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regarding Defendant Donna M. Jaques set for 8/8/19 @ 9:30 AM is continued to 9/5/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Mr. Duffy may appear by telephone and is to provide his telephone number to the CRM, Toni Fujinaga, at 541-1297. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regarding Defendant Donna M. Jaques :. Motion Hearing is set for 8/8/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (tbf, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regarding Defendant Donna M. Jaques Charles M. Duffy appearing for Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Venice Y. Lim, #3 Lim Ex 1, #4 Lim Ex 2, #5 Lim Ex 3, #6 Lim Ex 4, #7 Lim Ex 5, #8 Declaration of Charles M. Duffy, #9 Duffy Ex A, #10 Duffy Ex B, #11 Duffy Ex C, #12 Duffy Ex D, #13 Duffy Ex E, #14 Duffy Ex F, #15 Duffy Ex G, #16 Duffy Ex H, #17 Duffy Ex I, #18 Duffy Ex J, #19 Duffy Ex K)(Duffy, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 09:00AM is continued to 9/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Scheduling Conference Statements are now due 9/3/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(wnn, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00184 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 EO: The Court directs the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Magistrate Judge Trader will remain as the Magistrate Judge on this case.. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Donna M. Jaques. /s/ SUE BEITIA, CLERK by C.Brost, Deputy Clerk. (cib)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Entry of Default by Clerk Pertaining to Defendant Donna M. Jaques Charles M. Duffy appearing for Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles M. Duffy, #2 Duffy Ex A)(Duffy, Charles) Modified on 6/7/2019 to terminate motion and add request to docket text(cib).
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 Consent Election Form. (emt, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Pursuant to Charles Duffy's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 7/10/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 7/3/19. Mr. Duffy is allowed to participate by telephone. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Donna M. Jaques served on 5/9/2019 filed by United States of America.(Duffy, Charles) Modified on 5/17/2019 to add service date (cib).
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. Do not e-file the Election Form. After completing the form, parties can either email it to consent@hid.uscourts.gov, or mail it to U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd., Room C-338, Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov The party filing the case or removal is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice and the attached Election Form. (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/10/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Donna M. Jaques. (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00184 RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donna M. Jaques, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duffy, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jaques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna M. Jaques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Harry Yee
Represented By: Charles M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?