Belau Electric, LLC v. RWT LLC et al

Plaintiff: Belau Electric, LLC
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company and RWT LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00185
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Belau Electric, LLC - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. This action is dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (emt, )
June 25, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the docket number #13 Stipulation Dismissing Action Without Prejudice filed by Belau Electric, LLC shall be submitted for consideration to Judge Jill A. Otake at otake_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (emt, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Dismissing Action Without Prejudcie by Belau Electric, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Certificate of Service )(Batterman, Scott) Modified on 6/25/2019 (emt, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Belau Electric, LLC. RWT LLC served on 6/6/2019 . (Batterman, Scott) Modified on 6/17/2019 (emt, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd. for Arch Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ogawa, Roy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Arch Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed on 4/11/19 by Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ogawa, Roy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiff's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/109 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 7/3/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 6/26/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Belau Electric, LLC. Arch Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Batterman, Scott)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/10/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, RWT LLC. (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00185 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Batterman, Scott)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Belau Electric, LLC. (Batterman, Scott)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, RWT LLC, filed by Belau Electric, LLC.(Batterman, Scott) Modified on 4/22/2019: receipt #: 0975-2184948, $ 400.00. (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belau Electric, LLC v. RWT LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Roy T. Ogawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RWT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belau Electric, LLC
Represented By: Gerald S. Clay
Represented By: Scott I. Batterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?