Jonah v. CACH, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Lili Jonah
Defendant: CACH, LLC and Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00188
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 EO: The Court has been informed that a settlement has been reached #21 . All upcoming hearings/deadlines are VACATED. The parties shall submit the appropriate dismissal documents to otake_orders@hid.uscourts.gov no later than July 17, 2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Lili Jonah of settlement Lili Jonah. (Brackett, Justin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Planning Meeting of Plaintiff and Defendant CACH, LLC; Certificate of Service. (Brackett, Justin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2019 is CONTINUED to 6/24/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 5/20/2019. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER recused. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00188 JAO-WRP on all further filings. (emt, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CACH, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LVNV Funding, LLC for CACH, LLC.. (Gualano, Sianha)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant CACH, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed April 11, 2019; Certificate of Service by CACH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gualano, Sianha)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC. (Minkin, David)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Miyoko T. Pettit-Toledo on behalf of Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC on behalf of Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC. (Pettit-Toledo, Miyoko)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan K. Inafuku on behalf of Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC on behalf of Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC. (Inafuku, Jordan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC.(Minkin, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lili Jonah. Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC served on 4/15/2019 . (Brackett, Justin) Modified on 4/17/2019 (emt, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lili Jonah. CACH, LLC on 4/16/2019 . (Brackett, Justin) Modified on 4/17/2019 (emt, ).
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/10/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC. (emt, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CACH, LLC. (emt, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00188 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2185291.), filed by Lili Jonah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Declaration Verification of Complaint, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jonah v. CACH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACH, LLC
Represented By: Sianha M. Gualano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC
Represented By: Jordan K. Inafuku
Represented By: Miyoko T. Pettit-Toledo
Represented By: David J. Minkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lili Jonah
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?