Platt v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Skylar John Platt
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00192
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skylar John Platt. Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beaver, Danielle)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Moriyama on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Moriyama, Rachel)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00192DKW-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/08/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 05/08/2019. (apg, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Department of Justice. (emt, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00192 DKW-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Beaver, Danielle)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Skylar John Platt. (Beaver, Danielle)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2187216.), filed by Skylar John Platt. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Beaver, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platt v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skylar John Platt
Represented By: Danielle Rose Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?