Sekigawa v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Garret Sekigawa
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00204
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Garret Sekigawa. Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beaver, Danielle)
June 4, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket number #7 Summons Returned Executed filed by Garret Sekigawa, is incomplete. There is no document attached to Exhibit 1. (jo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Garret Sekigawa. Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beaver, Danielle)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Moriyama on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Moriyama, Rachel)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. (cib)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00204-JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Beaver, Danielle)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2189597.), filed by Garret Sekigawa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaver, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sekigawa v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garret Sekigawa
Represented By: Danielle Rose Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?