Moore v. Tash

Plaintiff: Christopher P. Moore
Defendant: Paul A. Tash
Case Number: 1:2019cv00226
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
2 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Christopher P. Moore of Voluntary Dismissal Christopher P. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Braswell, Jason)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Based on Plaintiff's counsel's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 06/26/2019 is CONTINUED to 7/30/2019 at 09:15AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 EO: Based on Plaintiff's counsel's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 06/26/2019 is CONTINUED to 06/26/2019 at 09:15AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI'S REFERRED CIVIL CASES - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/8/2019. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00226 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019 . (emt, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Paul A. Tash served on 5/2/2019 filed by Christopher P. Moore.(Braswell, Jason) Modified on 5/7/2019 to add service date (cib).
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant Paul A. Tash (jo)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 6/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00226 LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. (jo)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Braswell, Jason)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul A. Tash ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2194551.), filed by Christopher P. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Braswell, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Tash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Tash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher P. Moore
Represented By: Jason R. Braswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?