Freitas v. Kobayashi
Petitioner: Mr. John Ferdinand Freitas
Respondent: Hiromichi Kobayshi and Hiromichi Kobayashi
Case Number: 1:2019cv00228
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
2 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
3 Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #10 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION and #11 Clerk's Judgment shall be served by First Class Mail to John Ferdinand Freitas at the address of record on June 10, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 6/7/2019 pursuant to ECF No. #10 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 6/7/2019. (emt, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from John Ferdinand Freitas, dated May 22, 2019 re: Filing Fee. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation, #2 Clerk's Office Intake Staff's Response to Letter, dated May 29, 2019) (emt, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 PLRA Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number HI026516 re #1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus. (emt, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Office Intake Staff's Letter responding to John Ferdinand Freitas' letters, dated May 22, 2019 re ECF No. #6 . (CV 19-00203 JAO-WRP; CV 19-00228 JAO-WRP) (emt, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to Clerk of Court from John Ferdinand Freitas, dated May 6, 2019. (CV 19-00203 JAO-WRP; CV 19-00228 JAO-WRP) (Attachments: #1 Deficiency Order in CV 19-203 JAO-RLP, #2 Letter Re: Filing Fees in CV 19-203 JAO-WRP; CV 19-228 JAO-WRP, dated May 14, 2019, #3 Letter Requesting Copy of Writ of Mandamus, CV 19-228 JAO-RLP and notice of court dates in CV 19-203 JAO-WRP, dated May 15, 2019, #4 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Letter addressed to Judge Jill A. Otake from Petitioner John Ferdinand Freitas, dated May 15, 2019. (CV 19-00203 JAO-WRP; CV 19-00228 JAO-WRP) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/13/2019. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE and MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT, MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00228 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings . (emt, )
May 6, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - On May 7, 2019, a copy of #2 Status Report Order and #3 Deficiency Order will be served by First Class Mail to the address of record for John Ferdinand Freitas. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the documents electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jo)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/1/2019. (jo)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Court will assess case status on Monday, August 5, 2019 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/1/2019. (jo)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.S. 1361 - - filed by Petitioner John Ferdinand Freitas "Action to Compel An Officer of The United States to Perform His Duty" (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitas v. Kobayashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. John Ferdinand Freitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hiromichi Kobayshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hiromichi Kobayashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?